Niederreuther v. City of Atwater
Plaintiff: Thomas E. Niederreuther
Defendant: City of Atwater
Case Number: 1:2019cv00779
Filed: June 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale A Drozd
Referring Judge: Barbara A McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:621
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER by City of Atwater. Attorney Christian, Michael J. added.(Christian, Michael)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER: (TEXT Only) Parties wishing to appear telephonically at the SCHEDULING CONFERENCE currently set for Thursday, September 12, 2019 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe may do so with each party using the following dial-in number and passcode: dial-in number 1-877-411-9748; passcode 3190866. Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/5/2019. (Valdez, E)
June 4, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 9/12/2019 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Martin-Gill, S)
June 4, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *City of Atwater* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Keith M. Velleca* *Law Office of Keith M. Velleca* *One Market Street, Suite 3600* *San Francisco, CA 94105*. (Martin-Gill, S)
June 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Against City Of Atwater By Thomas E. Niederreuther against Thomas E Niederreuther by Thomas E Niederreuther. Attorney Velleca, Keith M. added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8292311) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Case Cover Sheet)(Velleca, Keith)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Niederreuther v. City of Atwater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Atwater
Represented By: Shane R. Larsen
Represented By: Michael J. Christian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas E. Niederreuther
Represented By: Keith M. Velleca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?