(HC) Vasquez v. Sullivan

Petitioner: Tony Vasquez
Respondent: William Sullivan
Case Number: 1:2019cv00811
Filed: June 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
Presiding Judge: Dale A Drozd
Referring Judge: Sheila K Oberto
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 14 DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by William Sullivan. (Cary, Amanda)
July 3, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Amanda Diane Cary on behalf of William Sullivan. Attorney Cary, Amanda Diane added. (Cary, Amanda)
June 26, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: 12 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case served on Tony Vasquez. (Jessen, A)
June 26, 2019 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY): Pursuant to Decline of Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge, this case has been assigned to District Judge Dale A. Drozd and Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. The new case number is: 1:19-cv-00811-DAD-SKO (HC). (Jessen, A)
June 26, 2019 Filing 11 DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Tony Vasquez. (Jessen, A)
June 26, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS to CCI, P.O. Box 1902, Tehachapi, CA 93581 by Tony Vasquez. (Jessen, A)
June 13, 2019 Filing 9 DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus served on Tami Krenzen. (Sant Agata, S)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RESPONDENT'S ORDER RE CONSENT OR REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 6/13/2019. (Sant Agata, S)
June 13, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Order Directing Respondent to File a Response to the Petition served on Tony Vasquez. (Sant Agata, S)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DIRECTING RESPONDENT to File a Response to Petition signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 6/12/2019. Clerk to serve a copy of this order, a copy of the Petition and the Order re Consent on the Attorney General. (Sant Agata, S)
June 11, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Order Authorizing IFP Status, served on Tony Vasquez. (Gonzalez, R)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER AUTHORIZING IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS as to William Sullivan, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 6/11/19. (Gonzalez, R)
June 11, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order and #5 Prisoner New Case Documents served on Tony Vasquez. (Henshaw, R)
June 11, 2019 Filing 5 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 7/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Henshaw, R)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER of INTRADISTRICT TRANSFER from Sacramento (2:19-cv-1026 CKD) to Fresno (1:19-cv-0811 SKO) signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 6/11/2019. (Henshaw, R)
June 6, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Tony Vasquez. (Reader, L)
June 6, 2019 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 7/11/2019 (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Reader, L)
June 5, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Tony Vasquez. (Reader, L)
June 5, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against William Sullivan by Tony Vasquez.(Reader, L)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC) Vasquez v. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William Sullivan
Represented By: Amanda Diane Cary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Tony Vasquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?