Sierra v. FCA US LLC
Plaintiff: Gail Sierra
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00828
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Erica P Grosjean
Referring Judge: Lawrence J O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 15:2301
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: (Barker, John)
July 18, 2019 Filing 8 DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Gail Sierra. (Barker, John)
July 11, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to REMAND by Gail Sierra. Motion Hearing set for 9/17/2019 at 08:30 AM before Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proof of Service)(Barker, John)
June 14, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by FCA US LLC. (Hanson, Erin)
June 14, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS by John D. Barker. (Barker, John)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 10/8/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Marrujo, C)
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Erin E. Hanson re #1 Notice of Removal. (Hanson, Erin)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by FCA US LLC (Hanson, Erin)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Tulare County Superior Court, case number PCU278420 by All Plaintiffs. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8311647) (Attachments: #1 Notice Notice of Interested Parties)(Hanson, Erin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sierra v. FCA US LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: Roger G. Perkins
Represented By: Erin Elizabeth Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gail Sierra
Represented By: John D. Barker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?