Chamberlain v. Baker Hughes, a GE Company, LLC
Plaintiff: Michael Chamberlain
Defendant: Baker Hughes, a GE Company, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00831
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale A Drozd
Referring Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Filing 12 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Michael Chamberlain.(Sant Agata, S)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING Joint Stipulation signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 7/31/2019. (Sant Agata, S)
July 30, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Granting Joint Stipulatin Regarding Operative Pleadings and Submission to Mandatory Arbitration by Baker Hughes, a GE Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 in Support of Joint Stipulation Regarding Operative Pleadings and Submission to Mandatory Arbitration, #2 Exhibit 2 in Support of Joint Stipulation Regarding Operative Pleadings and Submission to Mandatory Arbitration, #3 Proposed Order Granting Joint Stipulation Regarding Operative Pleadings and Submission to Mandatory Arbitration)(Mashouf, Fatemeh)
June 20, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER by Baker Hughes, a GE Company, LLC.(Mashouf, Fatemeh)
June 14, 2019 Filing 8 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 9/11/2019 at 08:45 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Worksheet, #3 Consent Form, #4 VDRP) (Flores, E)
June 14, 2019 Filing 7 DEMAND for TRIAL by JURY by Michael Chamberlain. Attorney Guleser, Ann Benin added. (Guleser, Ann)
June 14, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Michele Haydel Gehrke on behalf of Baker Hughes, a GE Company, LLC. Attorney Gehrke, Michele Haydel added. (Gehrke, Michele)
June 13, 2019 RECEIPT number #CAE200098829 $400.00 fbo Baker Hughes by Sacramento Legal Support on 6/13/2019. (Zignago, K.)
June 13, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Baker Hughes, a GE Company, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, #4 Declaration, #3 Declaration, #2 Notice of Interested Parties. (Mashouf, Fatemeh)
June 13, 2019 Filing 4 DECLARATION of Fatemeh S. Mashouf re #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Mashouf, Fatemeh)
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Christina Keehan re #1 Notice of Removal. (Mashouf, Fatemeh)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Baker Hughes, a GE Company, LLC. (Mashouf, Fatemeh)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Kern County Superior Court, case number BCV-19-101309 by Baker Hughes, a GE Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet civil cover sheet)(Mashouf, Fatemeh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chamberlain v. Baker Hughes, a GE Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baker Hughes, a GE Company, LLC
Represented By: Fatemeh Sadat Mashouf
Represented By: Michele Haydel Gehrke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Chamberlain
Represented By: Karl Gerber
Represented By: Ann Benin Guleser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?