Hernandez et al v. Bobst, North America, Inc.
Plaintiff: Michael Hernandez and Becky Hernandez
Defendant: Bobst, North America, Inc.
Claimant: Pacific Southwest Container LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00882
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J O'Neill
Referring Judge: Sheila K Oberto
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Bobst, North America, Inc.. (Reynolds, Michael)
August 1, 2019 Filing 8 DEMAND for TRIAL by JURY by Bobst, North America, Inc.. (Reynolds, Michael)
August 1, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Bobst, North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Demand for Jury Trial)(Thurston, Damon)
July 26, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Becky Hernandez, Michael Hernandez. (Cloyd, Jeremy)
July 26, 2019 Filing 5 STIPULATION EXTENDING DEFENDANT'S TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Bobst, North America, Inc.. (Reynolds, Michael)
July 24, 2019 Filing 4 DEMAND for TRIAL by JURY by Becky Hernandez, Michael Hernandez. (Cloyd, Jeremy)
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF LODGING DOCUMENT(S) ELECTRONICALLY by Pacific Southwest Container LLC: Notice of Lien. (Parker, Connie)
June 27, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 10/22/2019 at 09:45 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Jessen, A)
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Stanislaus, case number CV-19-001908 by Becky Hernandez, Michael Hernandez. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8334164) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A & B, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proof of Service Certificate of Service)(Reynolds, Michael) (REFUNDED 0972-8334138 DUPLICATE PAYMENT) Modified on 7/2/2019 (Washington, S).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hernandez et al v. Bobst, North America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Hernandez
Represented By: Jeremy Daniel Cloyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Becky Hernandez
Represented By: Jeremy Daniel Cloyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobst, North America, Inc.
Represented By: Michael R Reynolds
Represented By: Damon Michael Thurston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Pacific Southwest Container LLC
Represented By: Connie M. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?