Stockstill v. Fresno Department of Social Services et al
Plaintiff: Jackie Stockstill
Defendant: Alecia Kay Eugene-Chasten, Ajit Singh, Fresno Housing Authority, Fresno Department of Social Services, Fresno Unified School District, Baz Allergy, Asthma & Sinus Center, Central Unified School District, Family Health Center, Sidhu Hardev Sinh and Calviva Health
Case Number: 1:2019cv00889
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Anthony W Ishii
Referring Judge: Sheila K Oberto
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION to DISMISS, MOTION to DISMISS for LACK of JURISDICTION ( Motion Hearing set for 10/16/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto.) by Calviva Health. Attorney Daponde, Michael J. added. (Attachments: #1 Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Jeffery Nkansah, #3 Request for Judicial Notice)(Daponde, Michael)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' EX PARTE APPLICATIONS FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Docs. 19, 21) signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 08/26/219. (Gonzales, V)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME #17 signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 08/26/2019. (Gonzales, V)
August 26, 2019 Filing 25 ASSOCIATION of ATTORNEY: Added attorney Daniel L. Wainwright for Baz Allergy, Asthma & Sinus Center. (Ball, Michael)
August 26, 2019 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Ajit Singh re #23 MOTION to DISMISS. (White, William)
August 26, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION to DISMISS by Ajit Singh. Attorney White, William M. added. Motion Hearing set for 9/30/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. (White, William)
August 26, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #26 Order on Motion for Extension, #27 Order served on Alecia Kay Eugene-Chasten, Sidhu Hardev Sinh, Jackie Stockstill. (Gonzales, V)
August 23, 2019 Filing 22 AFFIDAVIT re #21 Ex Parte Application, Proof of Service by Mail of Ex Parte Application for Extension of Time by Baz Allergy, Asthma & Sinus Center. (Ball, Michael)
August 23, 2019 Filing 21 EX PARTE APPLICATION by Baz Allergy, Asthma & Sinus Center for Initial Extension of Time To Respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, Declaration of Daniel L. Wainwright. Attorney Ball, Michael F added. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E-Mail to Plaintiff re Request for Extension of Time)(Ball, Michael)
August 22, 2019 Filing 20 AMENDED ANSWER by Alecia Kay Eugene-Chasten.(Marrujo, C)
August 22, 2019 Filing 19 EX PARTE APPLICATION by Fresno Department of Social Services for an Initial Extension to Time to Respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint; Declaration of Leslie M Dillahunty. Attorney Dillahunty, Leslie M. added. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Dillahunty, Leslie)
August 21, 2019 Filing 18 ANSWER to the Complaint by Sidhu Hardev Sinh.(Marrujo, C)
August 21, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for 30-DAY EXTENSION OF TIME to Respond to the Complaint by Sidhu Hardev Sinh. (Marrujo, C)
August 19, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to the Complaint, by Alecia Kay Eugene-Chasten.(Marrujo, C)
August 19, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Alecia Kay Eugene-Chasten. (Marrujo, C)
August 19, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE as to Jackie Stockstill. (Marrujo, C)
August 5, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Baz Allergy, Asthma & Sinus Center served on 8/5/2019, answer due 8/26/2019; Calviva Health served on 8/5/2019, answer due 8/26/2019; Central Unified School District served on 8/5/2019, answer due 8/26/2019; Alecia Kay Eugene-Chasten served on 8/5/2019, answer due 8/26/2019; Family Health Center served on 8/5/2019, answer due 8/26/2019; Fresno Department of Social Services served on 8/5/2019, answer due 8/26/2019; Fresno Housing Authority served on 8/5/2019, answer due 8/26/2019; Fresno Unified School District served on 8/5/2019, answer due 8/26/2019; Ajit Singh served on 8/5/2019, answer due 8/26/2019; Sidhu Hardev Sinh served on 8/5/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. (Gonzalez, R)
August 1, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Jackie Stockstill. (Marrujo, C)
August 1, 2019 Filing 11 DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Jackie Stockstill. (Marrujo, C)
August 1, 2019 Filing 10 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Jackie Stockstill.(Marrujo, C)
July 23, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Baz Allergy, Asthma & Sinus Center, Family Health Center, Sidhu Hardev Sinh* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Jackie Stockstill* *4064 E. Dwight Way* *#202* *Fresno, CA 93702*. (Sant Agata, S)
July 23, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Calviva Health, Central Unified School District, Fresno Unified School District* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Jackie Stockstill* *4064 E. Dwight Way* *#202* *Fresno, CA 93702*. (Sant Agata, S)
July 22, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Fresno Housing Authority, Ajit Singh* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Jackie Stockstill* *4064 E. Dwight Way* *#202* *Fresno, CA 93702*. (Sant Agata, S)
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Alecia Kay Eugene-Chasten, Fresno Department of Social Services* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Jackie Stockstill* *4064 E. Dwight Way* *#202* *Fresno, CA 93702*. (Sant Agata, S)
July 15, 2019 Filing 5 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 11/7/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 Informational Order) (Marrujo, C)
July 15, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Civil New Case Documents for AWI served on Jackie Stockstill. (Marrujo, C)
July 12, 2019 RECEIPT number #CAE100042879 $400.00 fbo Jackie Stockstill by Jackie Stockstill on 6/28/2019. (Marrujo, C)
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Fee Previously Paid by Jackie Stockstill. (Marrujo, C)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER directing Plaintiff to pay the $400.00 filing fee or submit a completed application to proceed in forma paupers within 30 Days signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 7/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application). (Lundstrom, T)
July 2, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Order served on Jackie Stockstill. (Lundstrom, T)
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Jackie Stockstill. (Lundstrom, T)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Fresno Department of Social Services, Alecia Kay Eugene-Chasten, Fresno Housing Authority, Ajit Singh, MD by Jackie Stockstill. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lundstrom, T)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stockstill v. Fresno Department of Social Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alecia Kay Eugene-Chasten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ajit Singh
Represented By: William M. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fresno Housing Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fresno Department of Social Services
Represented By: Leslie M. Dillahunty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fresno Unified School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baz Allergy, Asthma & Sinus Center
Represented By: Michael F Ball
Represented By: Daniel L. Wainwright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Unified School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Family Health Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sidhu Hardev Sinh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Calviva Health
Represented By: Michael J. Daponde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jackie Stockstill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?