(PC) Reinhardt v. Hamlin et al
Plaintiff: David Michael Reinhardt
Defendant: Kathleen A. Meehan, Arlan Harrell, Brad R. Hill, Jennifer R.S. Detjen, Tani Gorre Cantil-Sakauye, Donald R. Franson, Gene M Gomes, Stephen J Kane, Rosendo Pena, Jr., Rebecca A Wiseman, Ronald M George, Gary Orozco, Thomas Desantos, Gary Hoff, Charles S. Poochigian, James R. Oppliger, Herbert I Levy, W. Kent Hamlin, James A Ardaiz, Dennis A. Cornell, M. Bruce Smith and Marvin R. Baxter
Case Number: 1:2019cv00892
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Sheila K Oberto
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #23 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on David Michael Reinhardt. (Jessen, A)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING #3 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 7/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 IFP Motion) (Jessen, A)
July 22, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE to Court Concerning Type of Case Petitioner Filed - Ex-Parte by David Michael Reinhardt. (Jessen, A)
July 15, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #21 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel served on David Michael Reinhardt. (Jessen, A)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER DENYING #2 & #10 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 7/15/2019. (Jessen, A)
July 11, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to APPOINT COUNSEL by David Michael Reinhardt. (Gonzalez, R)
July 11, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Remove as a Defendant Any Defendant United States Marshal is Physically Unable to Serve, by David Michael Reinhardt. (Gonzalez, R)
July 11, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION Requesting the U.S. Marshal to Serve the Initial Complaint, by David Michael Reinhardt. (Gonzalez, R)
July 11, 2019 Filing 17 FIRST AMENDED PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT by David Michael Reinhardt. (Gonzalez, R)
July 8, 2019 Filing 16 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by David Michael Reinhardt. (Gonzalez, R)
July 8, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Hearing on Apparent Conflict of Interest of Court or Judges, by David Michael Reinhardt. (Gonzalez, R)
July 3, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #14 Screening Order served on David Michael Reinhardt. (Jessen, A)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Granting Leave to Amend signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 7/2/2019. First Amended Complaint, Habeas Corpus Petition, or Notice of Voluntary Dismissal due within twenty-one (21) days. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint Form, #2 Habeas Corpus Petition Form (2254)). (Jessen, A)
July 2, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFIED PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by David Michael Reinhardt. (Jessen, A)
June 28, 2019 Filing 12 CLERKS NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for David Michael Reinhardt, CDC F-07622 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsFresno@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Jessen, A)
June 28, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #11 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on David Michael Reinhardt. (Jessen, A)
June 28, 2019 Filing 11 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED: Plaintiff's Consent or Decline due within thirty (30) days. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Jessen, A)
June 28, 2019 Filing 10 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Northern; Case Number 5:19-cv-02343.
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF TRANSFER. This action is TRANSFERRED to the Eastern District. The Clerk shall transfer this action forthwith. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 6/28/19. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(dmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2019) [Transferred from cand on 6/28/2019.]
June 10, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Hearing filed by David Michael Reinhardt. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2019) [Transferred from cand on 6/28/2019.]
May 28, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Summary Judgment, MOTION for Hearing filed by David Michael Reinhardt. Responses due by 6/25/2019. Replies due by 7/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2019) [Transferred from cand on 6/28/2019.]
May 9, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by David Michael Reinhardt.. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2019) [Transferred from cand on 6/28/2019.]
April 30, 2019 Filing 5 Letter from David Michael Reinhardt. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2019) [Transferred from cand on 6/28/2019.]
April 30, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2019) (cv, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from cand on 6/28/2019.]
April 30, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by David Michael Reinhardt. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/2/2019: #1 certificate) (cv, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from cand on 6/28/2019.]
April 30, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by David Michael Reinhardt. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2019) (cv, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from cand on 6/28/2019.]
April 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kent Hamlin M. Bruce Smith, James R. Oppliger, Gary Orozco, Rebecca A. Wiseman, Herbert I. Levy, Gene M. Gomes, Dennis A. Cornell, Stephen J Kane, James A. Ardaiz, Brad R. Hill, Donald R. Franson, Charles S. Poochigian, Rosendo Pena, Jr, Jennifer R.S. Detjen, Thomas DeSantos, Kathleen A. Meehan, George, Baxter and Tani Gorre Cantil-Sakauye. Filed by David Michael Reinhardt. Consent/Declination due by 5/14/2019. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/2/2019: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope) (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/2/2019 (cv, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from cand on 6/28/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Reinhardt v. Hamlin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen A. Meehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arlan Harrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad R. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer R.S. Detjen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tani Gorre Cantil-Sakauye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald R. Franson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gene M Gomes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen J Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosendo Pena, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca A Wiseman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald M George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Orozco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Desantos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Hoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles S. Poochigian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James R. Oppliger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Herbert I Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. Kent Hamlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James A Ardaiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis A. Cornell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Bruce Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marvin R. Baxter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Michael Reinhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?