Northfield Insurance Company v. Sandy's Place, LLC, et al.
Plaintiff: Northfield Insurance Company
Defendant: Sandy's Place, LLC, Monico Alejandrez, Rudy Gallegos, Jr., Sandy G. Self and Olen Self
Case Number: 1:2019cv00897
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J O'Neill
Referring Judge: Sheila K Oberto
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Monico Alejandrez served on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/9/2019. (Peterson, Mark)
August 22, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Olen Self served on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/9/2019. (Peterson, Mark)
August 22, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Sandy G. Self served on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/9/2019. (Peterson, Mark)
August 22, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Sandy's Place, LLC served on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/9/2019. (Peterson, Mark)
July 1, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 10/31/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Lundstrom, T)
July 1, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Monico Alejandrez, Rudy Gallegos, Jr., Sandy's Place, LLC, Olen Self, Sandy G. Self* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Mark Dennis Peterson* *Cates Peterson LLP* *4100 Newport Pl, Suite 230* *Newport Beach, CA 92660*. (Lundstrom, T)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF AND REIMBURSEMENT against All Defendants by Northfield Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Peterson, Mark)
June 28, 2019 PAYMENT for Civil Case filing fee in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0972-8335700. (Peterson, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Northfield Insurance Company v. Sandy's Place, LLC, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandy's Place, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monico Alejandrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rudy Gallegos, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandy G. Self
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olen Self
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northfield Insurance Company
Represented By: Mark Dennis Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?