(HC) Valdez v. Friend
Petitioner: Juan Valdez
Respondent: Martin Friend
Case Number: 1:2019cv00911
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J O'Neill
Referring Judge: Sheila K Oberto
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Filing 15 USCA CASE NUMBER 19-16644 for #13 Notice of Appeal filed by Juan Valdez. (Lundstrom, T)
August 22, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #13 Notice of Appeal, #14 Appeal Processed to USCA, served on Juan Valdez. (Lundstrom, T)
August 22, 2019 Filing 14 APPEAL PROCESSED to Ninth Circuit re #13 Notice of Appeal filed by Juan Valdez. Notice of Appeal filed *8/21/2019*, Complaint filed *7/3/2019* and Appealed Order / Judgment filed *8/13/2019*. Court Reporter: *None*. *Fee Status: IFP Granted on 7/9/2019* (Attachments: #1 Appeal Information) (Lundstrom, T)
August 21, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of APPEAL by Juan Valdez as to #12 Judgment. (Lundstrom, T)
August 13, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #11 Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations, #12 Judgment served on Juan Valdez. (Lundstrom, T)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 JUDGMENT dated *8/13/2019* pursuant to order signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 8/12/2019. (Lundstrom, T)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER adopting #8 Findings and Recommendations; dismissing Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus; denying Motion for Hearing #10 ; directing Clerk of Court to enter Judgment and close case; and declining to issue a certificate of appealability signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 8/12/2019. CASE CLOSED. (Lundstrom, T)
August 7, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Emergency Hearing for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 2241 by Juan Valdez. (Sant Agata, S)
August 5, 2019 Filing 9 OBJECTIONS to #8 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS by Petitioner Juan Valdez. (Sant Agata, S)
July 29, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #8 Findings and Recommendations (Motion) served on Juan Valdez. (Sant Agata, S)
July 29, 2019 Filing 8 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Dismiss #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 7/29/2019. Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. Objections to F&R due within Thirty (30) Days. (Sant Agata, S)
July 29, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel served on Juan Valdez. (Sant Agata, S)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DENYING #6 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 7/26/2019. (Sant Agata, S)
July 18, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Motion and MOTION to APPOINT COUNSEL by Juan Valdez. (Jessen, A)
July 15, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: 5 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case served on Juan Valdez. (Jessen, A)
July 15, 2019 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY): Pursuant to Decline of Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge, this case has been assigned to Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill and Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. The new case number is: 1:19-cv-00911-LJO-SKO (HC). (Jessen, A)
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Juan Valdez. (Jessen, A)
July 9, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #3 Order Authorizing IFP Status, #2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Juan Valdez. (Gonzalez, R)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER AUTHORIZING IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS as to Juan Valdez, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 7/9/19. (Gonzalez, R)
July 9, 2019 Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Petitioner's Consent or Decline Due Within Thirty Days. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Gonzalez, R)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 2241 PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against Martin Friend by Juan Valdez.(Gonzalez, R)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC) Valdez v. Friend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Martin Friend
Represented By: Dale Patrick
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Represented By: US Attorney's Office- 2241 Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Juan Valdez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?