Castellon v. MRC GLOBAL US INC. et al
Plaintiff: Louis Castellon
Defendant: MRC GLOBAL US INC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00918
Filed: July 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale A Drozd
Referring Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER: ***TEXT ENTRY ONLY*** Good cause appearing, and pursuant to the parties' stipulation, #13 , MOTION TO REMAND, #11 , currently set for 9/17/2019, is CONTINUED to 10/16/2019, at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. Minute order signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 8/28/2019. (Timken, A)
August 27, 2019 Filing 16 PROPOSED ORDER re Joint Stipulation to Continue Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand re #13 Stipulation by MRC GLOBAL US INC.. (Mazen, Khatib)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING IN PART #14 Stipulation for an Extension of Time to File Motion to Strike, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/26/2019. Initial Scheduling Conference CONTINUED to 11/21/2019 at 09:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
August 23, 2019 Filing 14 STIPULATION to Continue Plaintiff's Deadline to Bring Motion to Strike Defendant's Answer by MRC GLOBAL US INC.. (Mazen, Khatib)
August 23, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION re #11 MOTION to REMAND by MRC GLOBAL US INC.. (Mazen, Khatib)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER (TEXT ENTRY ONLY), signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/6/2019: In light of the motion to remand, the Initial Scheduling Conference set for 9/26/2019 is CONTINUED to 10/30/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
August 5, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to REMAND by Louis Castellon. Motion Hearing set for 9/17/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Tara Zabehi, #2 Proposed Order)(Zabehi, Tara)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER: (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 7/30/2019. Having considered the parties' #9 joint stipulation to extend time to file motion to strike answer, and good cause appearing, the court hereby grants the joint stipulation. The deadline for plaintiff to file a motion to strike defendant's answer is hereby continued to August 23, 2019. (Thorp, J)
July 24, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION by Louis Castellon. Attorney Zabehi, Tara added. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Zabehi, Tara)
July 9, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by MRC GLOBAL US INC. re #4 Declaration, #3 Declaration, #1 Notice of Removal, #5 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Mazen, Khatib)
July 8, 2019 Filing 7 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 9/26/2019 at 09:00 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Worksheet, #3 Consent Form, #4 VDRP) (Gonzalez, R)
July 5, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by MRC GLOBAL US INC. re #1 Notice of Removal,. (Crosner, Ryan)
July 5, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant MRC GLOBAL US INC.. (Crosner, Ryan)
July 5, 2019 Filing 4 DECLARATION of Cassandra Howell re #1 Notice of Removal,. (Crosner, Ryan)
July 5, 2019 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Ryan H. Crosner re #1 Notice of Removal,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Declaration of Ryan Crosner, #2 Exhibit B to Declaration of Ryan Crosner, #3 Exhibit C to Declaration of Ryan Crosner, #4 Exhibit D to Declaration of Ryan Crosner, #5 Exhibit E to Declaration of Ryan Crosner, #6 Exhibit F to Declaration of Ryan Crosner, #7 Exhibit G to Declaration of Ryan Crosner)(Crosner, Ryan)
July 5, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by MRC GLOBAL US INC. (Crosner, Ryan)
July 5, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Superior Court, County of Kern, case number BCV-19-101162 by Louis Castellon. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8344183) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit C to Notice of Removal, #4 Exhibit D to Notice of Removal, #5 Exhibit E to Notice of Removal, #6 Exhibit F to Notice of Removal, #7 Exhibit G to Notice of Removal)(Crosner, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Castellon v. MRC GLOBAL US INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MRC GLOBAL US INC.
Represented By: Johnnie A. James
Represented By: Ryan H. Crosner
Represented By: Khatib Mazen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis Castellon
Represented By: Edwin Aiwazian
Represented By: Tara Zabehi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?