(HC) Johnson v. Superior Court of the State of California for Kings County et al
Case Number: 1:2019cv00976
Filed: September 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER DISREGARDING Petitioner's 25 Miscellaneous Motion, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/13/2020. (Martin-Gill, S)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER DENYING Petitioner's Miscellaneous 22 23 Motions as MOOT signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/26/2020. (Sant Agata, S)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER DENYING Miscellaneous Motion as Moot 16 signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 12/16/2019. (Lundstrom, T)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER ADOPTING 13 Findings and Recommendations; ORDER Dismissing Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus; ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to Enter Judgment and Close Case; ORDER Declining to Issue Certificate of Appealability signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 12/03/2019. CASE CLOSED. (Flores, E)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Dimiss the 1 Petition for Failure to Comply signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/12/2019. Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. Objections to F&R due within Ten (10) Days. Orozco, A)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER ADOPTING 9 Findings and Recommendation Regarding Petitioner's Application for Release on Bail Pending Determination of Petition signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 11/6/2019. (Sant Agata, S)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to Assign District Judge; FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATION Regarding Petitioner's Application for Release on Bail Pending Determination of Petition, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/24/19. Objections to F&R Due Within Twenty One Days. (Marrujo, C)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC) Johnson v. Superior Court of the State of California for Kings County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?