(PC) Johnson v. Sherman, et al.
Plaintiff: Reginald Johnson
Defendant: J. Collins, Stuart Sherman and Richard Milan
Case Number: 1:2019cv00984
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Boone
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Filing 12 SECOND AMENDED PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against J. Collins, Richard Milan, Stuart Sherman by Reginald Johnson.(Martin-Gill, S)
August 19, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #11 Order, served on Reginald Johnson. (Martin-Gill, S)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SECOND SCREENING ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff One Final Opportunity to File an Amended Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/19/2019. (Amended Complaint due 30-Day Deadline) (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint Form)(Martin-Gill, S)
August 9, 2019 Filing 10 FIRST AMENDED PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Reginald Johnson.(Marrujo, C)
August 9, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Related Cases, by Reginald Johnson. (Marrujo, C)
July 24, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #8 Screening Order served on Reginald Johnson. (Lundstrom, T)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCREENING ORDER granting Plaintiff leave to file an amended complaint #1 signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/23/2019. Amended Complaint due within 30-Days. (Attachments: #1 Complaint Form).(Lundstrom, T)
July 23, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Reginald Johnson. (Lundstrom, T)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application, #2 Trust Account Statement) (Lundstrom, T)
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Reginald Johnson. (Lundstrom, T)
July 18, 2019 Filing 5 CLERKS NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for Reginald Johnson, CDC AU-1022 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsFresno@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Lundstrom, T)
July 18, 2019 Filing 4 DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on SATF.Filings@cdcr.ca.gov. for Reginald Johnson. (Lundstrom, T)
July 18, 2019 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *7/17/2019*; Consent or Decline due by 8/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 E-Filing Notice) (Lundstrom, T)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Reginald Johnson. (Lundstrom, T)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against J. Collins, Richard Milan, Stuart Sherman by Reginald Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (Lundstrom, T)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Johnson v. Sherman, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stuart Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Milan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reginald Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?