(PC) Dustin v. Kern Valley State Prison Personnel
Plaintiff: Dale Owen Dustin
Defendant: Kern Valley State Prison Personnel
Case Number: 1:2019cv00989
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Boone
Referring Judge: Lawrence J O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Dale Owen Dustin. (Marrujo, C)
August 15, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: 10 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case, served on Dale Owen Dustin. (Gonzalez, R)
August 15, 2019 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY) pursuant to Decline of Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge, this case has been assigned to Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill and Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. The new case number is: 1:19-cv-00989-LJO-SAB. (Gonzalez, R)
August 15, 2019 Filing 9 DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Dale Owen Dustin. (Gonzalez, R)
August 15, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS to KVSP, PO Box 5103, Delano, CA 93216 by Dale Owen Dustin. (Gonzalez, R)
July 23, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Order served on Dale Owen Dustin. (Marrujo, C)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER to Submit Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis OR Pay Filing Fee Within 45 Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/22/19. (Attachments: #1 IFP App & Instructions.Prisoner)(Marrujo, C)
July 19, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Dale Owen Dustin. (Lundstrom, T)
July 19, 2019 Filing 6 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 8/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Lundstrom, T)
July 19, 2019 Filing 5 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Northern; Case Number 4:19-cv-03730.
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 7/17/19. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2019) [Transferred from cand on 7/19/2019.]
June 28, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2019) [Transferred from cand on 7/19/2019.]
June 26, 2019 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 8/5/2019. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2019) [Transferred from cand on 7/19/2019.]
June 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kern Valley State Prison Personnel. Filed by D. Dustin. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2019) [Transferred from cand on 7/19/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Dustin v. Kern Valley State Prison Personnel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kern Valley State Prison Personnel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale Owen Dustin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?