Maria Corona et al v. Albence
Plaintiff: Maria Corona, Hector Corona-Bautista and Eliseo Gamez-Ochoa
Defendant: Matthew Albence
Case Number: 1:2019cv01104
Filed: August 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Boone
Referring Judge: Lawrence J O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Deportation
Cause of Action: 28:1651
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 Filing 10 OPPOSITION by Maria Corona to #8 MOTION to DISMISS for LACK of JURISDICTION . (Bakeman, Willard)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER: (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) Due to the pending Motion to Dismiss, the Scheduling Conference is reset from 11/5/2019 to 2/11/2020 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. A Joint Scheduling Report is due one week before the new conference date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/27/2019. (Hernandez, M)
September 23, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to DISMISS for LACK of JURISDICTION by Matthew Albence. Motion Hearing set for 10/29/2019 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. (Hemesath, Audrey)
August 30, 2019 Filing 7 DESIGNATION of COUNSEL FOR SERVICE. Added attorney Audrey Benison Hemesath for Matthew Albence (Hemesath, Audrey)
August 22, 2019 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE to Attorney Willard Bakeman re #5 Notice - Other: The document attached is for the incorrect case. Also, when filing a certificate of service, please use the certificate of service event and not the notice (other) event. Please re-file your document using the correct attachment and the correct event. (Sant Agata, S)
August 21, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE proof of service of scheduling conference by Maria Corona re #3 Civil New Case Documents for LJO. (Bakeman, Willard)
August 18, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Maria Corona. Matthew Albence served on 8/15/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit receipt)(Bakeman, Willard)
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 11/5/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Attachments: #1 SAB Sched Conf, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Martin-Gill, S)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Matthew Albence* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Willard P. Bakeman* *Law Office Of Willard Bakeman* *515 S. Euclid St* *Anaheim, CA 92802*. (Martin-Gill, S)
August 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Matthew Albence by Maria Corona. Attorney Bakeman, Willard P. added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8401356) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bakeman, Willard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maria Corona et al v. Albence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Albence
Represented By: Audrey Benison Hemesath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Corona
Represented By: Willard P. Bakeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hector Corona-Bautista
Represented By: Willard P. Bakeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eliseo Gamez-Ochoa
Represented By: Willard P. Bakeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?