Jerry Cox v. Mariposa County et al
Plaintiff: Jerry Cox
Defendant: Sheriff Deputy Wesley Smith, Mark Adams, Sheriff Deputy William Atkinson, Mariposa County, Ashley Harris, Mariposa County Sheriff's Office and California Receivership Group
Case Number: 1:2019cv01105
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Anthony W Ishii
Referring Judge: Barbara A McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 161 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Nayiri K. Pilikyan on behalf of Ashley Harris. Attorney Pilikyan, Nayiri K. added. (Pilikyan, Nayiri)
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 160 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Edward Crouse as Counsel by Ashley Harris. (Van Hoesen, AnnaMarie)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 159 MINUTE ORDER (TEXT Only): Due the status of this case, the Initial SCHEDULING CONFERENCE currently set for 6/21/2022 is continued to October 25, 2022, at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. The parties shall file a Joint Scheduling Report one week prior to the conference. The parties shall appear at the conference with each party connecting remotely either via Zoom video conference or Zoom telephone number. The parties will be provided with the Zoom ID and password by the Courtroom Deputy prior to the conference. The Zoom ID number and password are confidential and are not to be shared. Appropriate court attire required. NOTE: Motions to Dismiss (Docs. #132 and #135 ) pending. Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 5/18/2022. (Valdez, E)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 158 MINUTE ORDER (TEXT Only): Due to the current status of this case, the SCHEDULING CONFERENCE currently set for 4/20/2022 is HEREBY CONTINUED to June 21, 2022, at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. The parties shall file a Joint Scheduling Report one (1) week prior to the conference. The parties shall appear at the conference remotely with each party connecting either via Zoom video conference or Zoom telephone number. The parties will be provided with the Zoom ID and password by the Courtroom Deputy prior to the conference. The Zoom ID and password are confidential and are not to be shared. Appropriate court attire required. NOTE: Motions to Dismiss (Docs. #132 , #135 ) pending. Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/4/2022. (Valdez, E)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 157 MINUTE ORDER signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/02/2022: (Text Only Entry)) The Court has deemed the MOTION TO DISMISS, Doc. No. #135 , noticed for hearing on 3/07/2022, before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii, suitable for decision WITHOUT oral argument pursuant to Local Rule 230(g). As such, the hearing on same is VACATED and the motion will be taken under submission as of that date. Minute order signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/02/2022.(Gonzales, V)
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 156 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by Mariposa County, Sheriff Deputy Wesley Smith, Sheriff Deputy William Atkinson in re #155 Reply to Response to Motion. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit F, #2 Exhibit G)(Fujii, John)
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 155 REPLY by Mariposa County, Sheriff Deputy Wesley Smith, Sheriff Deputy William Atkinson to RESPONSE to #135 Motion to Dismiss. (Fujii, John)
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 154 REPLY by Ashley Harris to RESPONSE to #132 Motion to Dismiss. (Van Hoesen, AnnaMarie)
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 153 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Madeline P. Skitzki on behalf of Ashley Harris. Attorney Skitzki, Madeline P. added. (Skitzki, Madeline)
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 152 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Edward Crouse on behalf of Ashley Harris. Attorney Crouse, Edward added. (Crouse, Edward)
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 151 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Jenna Conwisar on behalf of Ashley Harris. Attorney Conwisar, Jenna added. (Conwisar, Jenna)
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 150 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by Jerry Cox in re #135 Motion to Dismiss. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice Exhibit 1)(Frucht, Kenneth)
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 149 OPPOSITION by Jerry Cox to #135 Motion to Dismiss. (Frucht, Kenneth)
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 148 OPPOSITION by Jerry Cox to #135 Motion to Dismiss. (Frucht, Kenneth)
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 147 OPPOSITION by Jerry Cox to #132 Motion to Dismiss. (Frucht, Kenneth)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 146 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Julia K. Hirata as Counsel by Ashley Harris. (Van Hoesen, AnnaMarie)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 145 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Anthony M. Basich as Counsel by Ashley Harris. (Van Hoesen, AnnaMarie)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 144 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by AnnaMarie H. Van Hoesen on behalf of Ashley Harris. Attorney Van Hoesen, AnnaMarie H. added. (Van Hoesen, AnnaMarie)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 143 STIPULATION and ORDER to Continue Briefing Schedule and Hearing on Defendants' Mariposa County, Sheriff Deputy William Atkinson, and Sheriff Deputy Wesley Smith's, and Defendant Ashley Harris' Motion to Dismiss signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/26/2022. Motion Hearing Continued to 3/7/2022 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. (Sant Agata, S)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 142 STIPULATION and Proposed Order by Jerry Cox. (Geonetta, Frederick)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 141 STIPULATION and ORDER to Continue the January 12, 2022 Mandatory Scheduling Conference signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/6/2022. Mandatory Scheduling Conference set for 4/20/2022 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Sant Agata, S)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 140 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Continuance of the January 12, 2022 Mandatory Scheduling Conference by Mariposa County, Sheriff Deputy Wesley Smith, Sheriff Deputy William Atkinson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fujii, John)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 139 JOINDER by Ashley Harris in re #135 Motion to Dismiss filed by Mariposa County, Sheriff Deputy William Atkinson, Sheriff Deputy Wesley Smith. (Basich, Anthony)
December 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 138 PROPOSED ORDER re Granting Defendants Mariposa County, Sheriff Deputy William Atkinson and Sheriff Deputy Wesley Smith's Motion to Dismiss Certain Claims in Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint re #135 MOTION to DISMISS by Mariposa County, Sheriff Deputy Wesley Smith, Sheriff Deputy William Atkinson. (Fujii, John)
December 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 137 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by Mariposa County, Sheriff Deputy Wesley Smith, Sheriff Deputy William Atkinson in re #135 Motion to Dismiss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Fujii, John)
December 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 136 MEMORANDUM by Mariposa County, Sheriff Deputy Wesley Smith, Sheriff Deputy William Atkinson in SUPPORT of #135 Motion to Dismiss. (Fujii, John)
December 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 135 MOTION to DISMISS by Mariposa County, Sheriff Deputy Wesley Smith, Sheriff Deputy William Atkinson. Motion Hearing set for 2/14/2022 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. (Fujii, John)
December 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 134 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by Ashley Harris in re #132 Motion to Dismiss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Basich, Anthony)
December 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 133 MEMORANDUM by Ashley Harris in SUPPORT OF re #132 Notice - Other filed by Ashley Harris. (Basich, Anthony)
December 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 132 NOTICE of Motion and Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint by Ashley Harris re #128 Amended Complaint. (Basich, Anthony) Modified on 12/28/2021 (Marrujo, C).
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 131 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Julia K Hirata on behalf of Ashley Harris. Attorney Hirata, Julia K added. (Hirata, Julia)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER to Extend Parties' Response Deadlines, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/2/2021. Defendants' Response to FAC: 12/28/2021. Plaintiff's Opposition: 1/21/2022. Defendants' Reply: 2/7/2022. Hearing Date: 2/14/2022. (Rivera, O)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 129 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for / Joint Stipulation to Extend Parties' Response Deadlines by Ashley Harris. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Basich, Anthony)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 128 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ashley Harris, Mariposa County, Sheriff Deputy Wesley Smith, Sheriff Deputy William Atkinson by Jerry Cox.(Geonetta, Frederick)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 127 CLERK'S NOTICE to Attorney Frederick Geonetta re #126 Amended Document: Please re-file your document using the event, Amended Complaint which can be found under the category Initial Pleadings and Service, Complaints and Other Initiating Documents. (Jessen, A)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 126 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Jerry Cox: Amended #1 Complaint. (Geonetta, Frederick)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER CORRECTING NUNC PRO TUNC OCTOBER 26, 2021 ORDER ON COUNTY DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS #123 ; ORDERED that this matter be referred back to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings consistent with this order, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 11/9/2021. ( Mariposa County Sheriff's Office terminated and Mariposa County Untermed)(Martin-Gill, S)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 124 MINUTE ORDER (TEXT Only): In light of the district court's orders issued on October 26, 2021, the Scheduling Conference currently set for November 9, 2021 is HEREBY CONTINUED to January 12, 2022, at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. Based on this continuance, the parties' stipulation to continue is unnecessary and is disregarded. (Doc. #121 .) The parties shall file a Joint Scheduling Report one (1) week prior to the January 12, 2022 conference. The parties shall appear at the conference remotely with each party connecting either via Zoom video conference or Zoom telephone number. The parties will be provided with the Zoom ID and password by the Courtroom Deputy prior to the conference. The Zoom ID and password are confidential and are not to be shared. Appropriate court attire required. Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/27/2021. (Valdez, E)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #45 County Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 10/26/2021. Mariposa County is TERMINATED as a defendant in this case. First Amended Complaint due within 21 days. This matter is referred back to the magistrate judge for further proceedings consistent with this order. (Rivera, O)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION TO DISMISS BY DEFENDANT ASHLEY HARRIS signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 10/26/2021. (Gonzales, V)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 121 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Continuance of November 9, 2021 Mandatory Scheduling Conference by Mariposa County, Mariposa County Sheriff's Office, Sheriff Deputy Wesley Smith, Sheriff Deputy William Atkinson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fujii, John)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER DENYING COUNTY DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO RECONSIDER ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR ABSTENTION AND STAY signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 10/13/2021. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED the County Defendants' motion for reconsideration (Doc. No. #114 ) is DENIED. The hearing on the County Defendants' motion for reconsideration set for October 18, 2021 is VACATED. (Gonzales, V)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 119 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by Mariposa County, Mariposa County Sheriff's Office, Sheriff Deputy Wesley Smith, Sheriff Deputy William Atkinson in re #114 Motion for Reconsideration,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E)(Fujii, John)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 118 REPLY by Mariposa County, Mariposa County Sheriff's Office, Sheriff Deputy Wesley Smith, Sheriff Deputy William Atkinson re #114 Motion for Reconsideration,. (Fujii, John)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 117 OPPOSITION by Jerry Cox to #114 Motion for Reconsideration,. (Frucht, Kenneth)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 116 PROPOSED ORDER re Motion for Reconsideration of Court's Order Denying Motion for Abstention and Stay re #114 Motion for Reconsideration,. (Fujii, John)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 115 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by Mariposa County, Mariposa County Sheriff's Office, Sheriff Deputy Wesley Smith, Sheriff Deputy William Atkinson in re #114 Motion for Reconsideration,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Fujii, John)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 114 MOTION for RECONSIDERATION re #112 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,, by Mariposa County, Mariposa County Sheriff's Office, Sheriff Deputy Wesley Smith, Sheriff Deputy William Atkinson. Motion Hearing set for 10/18/2021 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. (Fujii, John)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO STAY BY DEFENDANT ASHLEY HARRIS signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 8/23/2021. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion to stay brought by Defendant Ashley Harris (Doc. No. #53 ) is DENIED. (Gonzales, V)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR ABSTENTION AND STAY BY DEFENDANTS MARIPOSA COUNTY, MARIPOSA COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE, SHERIFF DEPUTY WILLIAM ATKINSON AND SHERIFF DEPUTY WESLEY SMITH signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 8/23/2021. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED the motion for abstention and stay brought by Defendants Mariposa County, Mariposa County Sheriff's Office, Sheriff Deputy William Atkinson, and Sheriff Deputy Wesley Smith (Doc. No. #47 ) is DENIED. All counsel appearing in this case will follow the filing protocol set forth in footnote 1 to this order. (Gonzales, V)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER GRANTING #110 Stipulation to Continue the August 30, 2021 Mandatory Scheduling Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/11/2021. 8/30/2021 Mandatory Scheduling Conference is CONTINUED to 11/9/2021 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. The parties shall file a Joint Scheduling Report one week prior to the conference. (Rivera, O)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 110 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for to Continue the August 30, 2021 Mandatory Scheduling Conference by Mariposa County, Mariposa County Sheriff's Office, Sheriff Deputy Wesley Smith, Sheriff Deputy William Atkinson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fujii, John)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER GRANTING #108 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/6/2021. Attorney Brian Adesman terminated. (Jessen, A)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 108 MOTION to WITHDRAW as ATTORNEY Brian M. Adesman as Counsel of Record by Ashley Harris. (Basich, Anthony)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 107 MINUTE ORDER (TEXT Only): Due to the current status of this case, the SCHEDULING CONFERENCE currently set for 6/17/2021 is continued to August 30, 2021, at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. The parties shall file an updated Joint Scheduling Report one week prior to the conference. The parties shall appear at the conference with each party connecting remotely either via Zoom video conference or Zoom telephone number. The parties will be provided with the Zoom ID and password by the Courtroom Deputy prior to the conference. The Zoom ID number and password are confidential and are not to be shared. Appropriate court attire required. NOTE: Motions to dismiss and Motions to Stay pending (Docs. #45 , #47 , #52 , and #53 .) Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/8/2021. (Valdez, E)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER GRANTING #105 Stipulation to Continue the April 5, 2021 Mandatory Scheduling Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/25/2021. Mandatory Scheduling Conference is CONTINUED to 6/17/2021 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. The parties shall file a Joint Scheduling Report one week prior to the conference. (Rivera, O)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 105 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Continuance of Scheduling Conference by Mariposa County. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fujii, John)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER GRANTING Stipulation to Continue Mandatory Scheduling Conference signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 2/11/2021. Initial Scheduling Conference set for 4/5/2021 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Jessen, A)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 103 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Continuance of Scheduling Conference by Mariposa County. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fujii, John)
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 102 MINUTE ORDER: (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) The Court has deemed the MOTION TO DISMISS, Docs. No. #45 and #52 , MOTION FOR ABSTENTION AND STAY, Doc. No #47 , and MOTION TO STAY, Doc. No #53 , noticed for hearing on 12/14/2020, before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii, suitable for decision WITHOUT oral argument pursuant to Local Rule 230(g). As such, the hearing on same is VACATED and the matter will be taken under submission as of that date. Minute order signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 12/08/2020. (Gonzales, V)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 101 SUPPLEMENT by Mariposa County re #48 Request for Judicial Notice, #47 MOTION Abstention and Stay re #45 Motion to Dismiss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit F, #2 Exhibit Exhibit G)(Fujii, John)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 100 DECLARATION of Amanda Jones re #99 Amended Document,. (Fujii, John)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 99 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Mariposa County: Amended #46 Request for Judicial Notice. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H)(Fujii, John)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 98 REPLY by Mariposa County re #69 Opposition to Motion, #47 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. (Fujii, John)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 97 REPLY by Mariposa County re #45 Motion to Dismiss, #68 Opposition to Motion. (Fujii, John)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 96 REPLY by Ashley Harris re #52 Motion to Dismiss. (Adesman, Brian)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 95 REPLY by Ashley Harris re #53 Motion to Stay. (Basich, Anthony)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER granting Joint Stipulation to continue 12/16/2020 Mandatory Scheduling Conference #93 signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/1/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 2/23/2021 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Lundstrom, T)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 93 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Joint Stipulation To Continue December 16, 2020 Mandatory Scheduling Conference by Mariposa County. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fujii, John)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 92 EXHIBIT H(3) to Geonetta Dec. re #53 Motion to Stay filed by Ashley Harris. (Frucht, Kenneth)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 91 EXHIBIT H(2) to Geonetta Dec. re #53 Motion to Stay filed by Ashley Harris. (Frucht, Kenneth)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 90 EXHIBIT H(1) to Geonetta Dec. re #53 Motion to Stay filed by Ashley Harris. (Frucht, Kenneth)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 89 EXHIBIT K to Geonetta Dec. re #53 Motion to Stay filed by Ashley Harris. (Frucht, Kenneth)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 88 EXHIBIT J to Geonetta Dec. re #53 Motion to Stay filed by Ashley Harris. (Frucht, Kenneth)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 87 EXHIBIT I to Geonetta Dec. re #53 Motion to Stay filed by Ashley Harris. (Frucht, Kenneth)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 86 EXHIBIT G to Geonetta Dec. re #53 Motion to Stay filed by Ashley Harris. (Frucht, Kenneth)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 85 DECLARATION of FRED GEONETTA in opposition to #53 Motion to Stay. (Attachments: #1 Exh. A1 to Geonetta Dec., #2 Exh. A2 to Geonetta Dec., #3 Exh. B1 to Geonetta Dec., #4 Exh. B2 to Geonetta Dec., #5 Exh. B3 to Geonetta Dec., #6 Exh. C1 to Geonetta Dec., #7 Exh. C2 to Geonetta Dec., #8 Exh. D to Geonetta Dec., #9 Exh. E to Geonetta Dec., #10 Exh. F to Geonetta Dec.)(Frucht, Kenneth)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 84 DECLARATION of Jerry Cox in opposition to #53 Motion to Stay. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Cox Dec.)(Frucht, Kenneth)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 83 EXHIBIT J to Request for Judicial Notice (Jerry Cox) re #53 Motion to Stay filed by Ashley Harris. (Frucht, Kenneth)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 82 EXHIBIT I to Request for Judicial Notice (Jerry Cox) re #53 Motion to Stay filed by Ashley Harris. (Frucht, Kenneth)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 81 EXHIBIT H to Request for Judicial Notice (Jerry Cox) re #53 Motion to Stay filed by Ashley Harris. (Frucht, Kenneth)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 80 EXHIBIT G to Request for Judicial Notice (Jerry Cox) re #53 Motion to Stay filed by Ashley Harris. (Frucht, Kenneth)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 79 EXHIBIT F to Request for Judicial Notice (Jerry Cox) re #53 Motion to Stay filed by Ashley Harris. (Frucht, Kenneth)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 78 EXHIBIT E to Request for Judicial Notice (Jerry Cox) re #53 Motion to Stay filed by Ashley Harris. (Frucht, Kenneth)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 77 EXHIBIT D to Request for Judicial Notice (Jerry Cox) re #53 Motion to Stay filed by Ashley Harris. (Frucht, Kenneth)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 76 EXHIBIT D to Request for Judicial Notice re #53 Motion to Stay filed by Ashley Harris. (Frucht, Kenneth)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 75 EXHIBIT C to Request for Judicial Notice re #53 Motion to Stay filed by Ashley Harris. (Frucht, Kenneth)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 74 EXHIBIT B to Request for Judicial Notice re #53 Motion to Stay filed by Ashley Harris. (Frucht, Kenneth)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 73 EXHIBIT A to Request for Judicial Notice re #53 Motion to Stay filed by Ashley Harris. (Frucht, Kenneth)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 72 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by Jerry Cox in re #71 Opposition to Motion. (Frucht, Kenneth)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 71 OPPOSITION by Jerry Cox to #53 Motion to Stay. (Frucht, Kenneth)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 70 OPPOSITION by Jerry Cox to #52 Motion to Dismiss. (Frucht, Kenneth)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 69 OPPOSITION by Jerry Cox to #47 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. (Frucht, Kenneth)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 68 OPPOSITION by Jerry Cox to #45 Motion to Dismiss. (Frucht, Kenneth)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 67 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR PLAINTIFF JERRY COX TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS AND MOTIONS FOR STAY/ABSTENTION; ORDER signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 10/02/2020. (Gonzales, V)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 66 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Hearing Continuance by Jerry Cox. (Frucht, Kenneth)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER GRANTING Stipulation to continue the August 26, 2020 Mandatory Scheduling Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/11/2020. (Scheduling Conference set for 12/16/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe) (Martin-Gill, S)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 64 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR PLAINTIFF JERRY COX TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS AND MOTIONS FOR STAY/ABSTENTION; ORDER signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 8/10/2020. The parties having stipulated, and good cause otherwise having been shown, the hearing date for all of Defendants' motions is hereby CONTINUED for 63 days from August 17, 2020 to October 19, 2020 at 1:30 p.m. before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. Plaintiff's opposition papers to each of the motions due 21 days before the new hearing date, and Defendants' reply papers due 7 days before the new hearing date. (Gonzales, V)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 63 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Continued Hearing by Jerry Cox. (Frucht, Kenneth)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 62 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Continued Hearing by Jerry Cox. (Frucht, Kenneth)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 61 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Continued Hearing by Jerry Cox. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Frucht, Kenneth)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR PLAINTIFFS TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT ASHLEY HARRIS'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND MOTION FOR STAY signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 6/25/2020. The Parties having stipulated, and good cause otherwise having been shown, the hearing date for both motions is hereby continued from July 6, to August 17, 2020. Having stipulated to a briefing schedule different from that provided in local rules, the Plaintiff's opposition papers due on July 27, 2020, 21 days before the new hearing date, and Defendant Harris's Reply papers due on August 10, 2020, 7 days before the new hearing date. (Gonzales, V)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER TO CONTINUE HEARING ON DEFENDANTS MARIPOSA COUNTY, MARIPOSA COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE, SHERIFF DEPUTY WILLIAM ATKINSON, AND SHERIFF DEPUTY WESLEY SMITH'S MOTION FOR ABSTENTION AND STAY, Doc. No. #47 , AND MOTION TO DISMISS Doc. No. #45 , signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 6/25/2020. The parties having stipulated, and good cause otherwise been shown, the hearing date for both motions is hereby continued for 28 days from July 20, 2020 to August 17, 2020 at 1:30 p.m. Plaintiff Jerry Cox's opposition papers are due fourteen days before the August 17, 2020 hearing date. (Gonzales, V)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 58 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Continuance by Jerry Cox. (Frucht, Kenneth)
June 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 57 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Continuance by Jerry Cox. (Frucht, Kenneth)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Continuance by Jerry Cox. (Frucht, Kenneth)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MINUTE ORDER (TEXT Only): Due to the current status of this case, the Initial SCHEDULING CONFERENCE is continued from 6/24/2020 to August 26, 2020 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. The parties shall file a Joint Scheduling Report one week prior to the conference. The parties are encouraged to appear at the conference by telephone with each party using the following dial-in number and access code: dial-in number 1-877-411-9748; access code 3219139. NOTE: Motions (Doc. #45 , #47 , #52 and #53 ) pending. Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 5/27/2020. (Valdez, E)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Brian Adesman on behalf of Ashley Harris. Attorney Adesman, Brian added. (Adesman, Brian)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MOTION to STAY by Ashley Harris. Motion Hearing set for 7/6/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. (Basich, Anthony)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MOTION to DISMISS by Ashley Harris. Motion Hearing set for 7/6/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. (Basich, Anthony)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Amy Egerton-Wiley on behalf of Ashley Harris. Attorney Egerton-Wiley, Amy added. (Egerton-Wiley, Amy)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Anthony M. Basich on behalf of Ashley Harris. Attorney Basich, Anthony M. added. (Basich, Anthony)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MINUTE ORDER (TEXT ONLY): In light of the restrictions on entering the Courthouse, and General Orders 610, 611, 612, 617 and 618, the parties are ordered to appear telephonically at the SCHEDULING CONFERENCE currently set for Wednesday, June 24, 2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. Parties may appear telephonically by using the following dial-in number and passcode: dial-in number 1-877-411-9748; passcode 3219139. Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 5/21/2020. (Valdez, E)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: 49 Minute Order, served on Ashley Harris. (Valdez, E)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by Mariposa County in re #47 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E)(Fujii, John)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MOTION Abstention and Stay re #45 Motion to Dismiss by Mariposa County. Motion Hearing set for 7/20/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum)(Fujii, John)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by Mariposa County in re #45 Motion to Dismiss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E)(Fujii, John)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MOTION to DISMISS by Mariposa County. Motion Hearing set for 7/20/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum)(Fujii, John)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER DENYING SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE BY DEFENDANTS MARIPOSA COUNTY, MARIPOSA COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE, SHERIFF DEPUTY WILLIAM ATKINSON, AND SHERIFF DEPUTY WESLEY SMITH signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 5/01/2020. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED the special motion to strike brought by Mariposa County, the Mariposa County Sherriff's Office, Sheriff Deputy William Atkinson and Sheriff Deputy Wesley Smith (Doc. No. #14 ) is DENIED in its entirety. (Gonzales, V)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER CONTINUING Scheduling Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/22/20. (Initial Scheduling Conference CONTINUED to 6/24/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe.)(Marrujo, C)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #43 Order, served on Ashley Harris. (Marrujo, C)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER DISMISSING Claims Against Defendant California Receivership Group and Defendant Mark Adams for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 4/6/2020. (Sant Agata, S)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER re Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendant Ashley Harris to File a Response to the Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/27/2020. Response Deadline: 5/26/2020. (Marrujo, C)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #41 Order on Motion for Extension served on Ashley Harris. (Marrujo, C)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MOTION for EXTENSION OF TIME to File a Response to the Complaint by Defendant Ashley Harris. (Marrujo, C)
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 NOTICE of Service on Ashley Harris by Mariposa County re #38 Request for Judicial Notice. (Fujii, John)
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by Mariposa County in re #14 Motion to Strike,. (Fujii, John)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Re Joint Stipulation to Continue the March 4, 2020 Mandatory Scheduling Conference (Doc. No. #36 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 2/26/2020. Pursuant to the parties' stipulation (Doc. No. #36 ), and good cause appearing due to the pending Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Strike (Doc. Nos. #6 , #14 ), the Mandatory Scheduling Conference currently set for March 4, 2020, is HEREBY CONTINUED to April 30, 2020, at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before the undersigned. A Joint Scheduling Report shall be filed one week prior to the conference. The parties are encouraged to appear at the conference by telephone with each party using the following dial-in number and access code: dial-in number 1-877-411-9748; access code 3219139. (Valdez, E)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #37 Order, served on Ashley Harris. (Valdez, E)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for To Continue the March 4, 2020 Mandatory Scheduling Conference by Mariposa County. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fujii, John)
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 STIPULATION and ORDER GRANTING #34 Motion for Extension of Time to File an Answer to the Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 02/12/2020. Answer due by 03/27/2020. (Flores, E)
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #35 Order on Motion for Extension served on Ashley Harris. (Flores, E)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for EXTENSION OF TIME to File an Answer to the Compaint by Ashley Harris. (Flores, E)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MINUTE ORDER (TEXT Only): The parties are hereby notified that the dial-in number and passcode for telephonic appearances before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe has been updated as follows: dial-in number 1-877-411-9748; passcode 3219139. Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/9/2020. (Valdez, E)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STIPULATION and ORDER to CONTINUE the January 15, 2020 Mandatory Scheduling Conference signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/8/2020. Mandatory Scheduling Conference set for 3/4/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Sant Agata, S)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for To Continue The January 15, 2020 Mandatory Scheduling Conference re 16 Minute Order,,, Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings,, by Mariposa County, Mariposa County Sheriff's Office, Sheriff Deputy Wesley Smith, Sheriff Deputy William Atkinson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fujii, John)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by Jerry Cox in re #28 Reply to Response to Motion. (Frucht, Kenneth)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MINUTE ORDER: (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) The Court has deemed MOTION TO STRIKE, Doc. No. #14 , noticed for hearing on 11/25/2019, before Senior District Judge Anthony W. Ishii, suitable for decision WITHOUT oral argument pursuant to Local Rule 230(g). As such, the hearing on same is VACATED and the matter will be taken under submission as of that date. Minute order signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 11/21/2019. (Gonzales, V)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 REPLY by Mariposa County, Mariposa County Sheriff's Office, Sheriff Deputy Wesley Smith, Sheriff Deputy William Atkinson to RESPONSE to #14 Motion to Strike,. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Request for Judicial Notice)(Fujii, John)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 OPPOSITION by Jerry Cox to #14 Motion to Strike,. (Frucht, Kenneth)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 OPPOSITION by Jerry Cox to #14 Motion to Strike,. (Frucht, Kenneth)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 OPPOSITION by Jerry Cox to #14 Motion to Strike,. (Frucht, Kenneth)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 OPPOSITION by Jerry Cox to #14 Motion to Strike,. (Frucht, Kenneth)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 OPPOSITION by Jerry Cox to #14 Motion to Strike,. (Frucht, Kenneth)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 OPPOSITION by Jerry Cox to #14 Motion to Strike,. (Frucht, Kenneth)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 OPPOSITION by Jerry Cox to #14 Motion to Strike,. (Frucht, Kenneth)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 OPPOSITION by Jerry Cox to #14 Motion to Strike,. (Frucht, Kenneth)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 OPPOSITION by Jerry Cox to #14 Motion to Strike,. (Frucht, Kenneth)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 OPPOSITION by Jerry Cox to #14 Motion to Strike,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits v. 1)(Frucht, Kenneth)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 OPPOSITION by Jerry Cox to #14 Motion to Strike,. (Frucht, Kenneth)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER (TEXT Only): Due to the current status of the case, the Initial SCHEDULING CONFERENCE is continued from 11/12/2019 to January 15, 2020, at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. The parties SHALL file a JOINT Scheduling Report one week prior to the conference. Parties wishing to appear telephonically at the conference may do so with each party using the following dial-in number and access code: dial-in number 1-877-411-9748; access code 3190866. NOTE: Motion to Dismiss, Motions to Strike (Docs. #6 , #14 ) pending. Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/6/2019. (Valdez, E)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for To Continue The November 12, 2019 Mandatory Scheduling Conference by Mariposa County, Mariposa County Sheriff's Office, Sheriff Deputy Wesley Smith, Sheriff Deputy William Atkinson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fujii, John)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION to STRIKE re #1 Complaint. by Mariposa County, Mariposa County Sheriff's Office, Sheriff Deputy Wesley Smith, Sheriff Deputy William Atkinson. Attorney Fujii, John Mamoru added. Motion Hearing set for 11/25/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. (Fujii, John)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR COUNTY DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S INITIAL COMPLAINT signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 10/11/2019. (Gonzales, V)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extending Time for County Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Initial Complaint re #1 Complaint by Mariposa County. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Extending Time for Response)(Fujii, John)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER: (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) The Court has deemed MOTION TO DISMISS/MOTION TO STRIKE, Doc. No. #6 , noticed for hearing on 10/15/2019, before Senior District Judge Anthony W. Ishii, suitable for decision WITHOUT oral argument pursuant to Local Rule 230(g). As such, the hearing on same is VACATED and the matter will be taken under submission as of that date. Minute order signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 10/09/219 (Gonzales, V)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 REPLY by Mark Adams, California Receivership Group re #9 Opposition to Motion,. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Adams, Andrew)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 OPPOSITION by Jerry Cox to #6 MOTION to DISMISS MOTION to STRIKE . (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jerry Cox, #2 Declaration of Marc Angelucci-v.1, #3 Declaration of Marc Angelucci-v.2, #4 Declaration of Marc Angelucci-v.3, #5 Declaration of Marc Angelucci-v.4, #6 Declaration of Marc Angelucci-v.5, #7 Declaration of Marc Angelucci-v.6, #8 Declaration of Marc Angelucci-v.7, #9 Rule 56(d) Affidavit, #10 Request for Judicial Notice)(Frucht, Kenneth)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Jerry Cox. (Frucht, Kenneth)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER ***TEXT ENTRY ONLY*** The MOTION TO DISMISS, MOTION TO STRIKE #6 currently set for 10/11/2019 at 9:00AM before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe is VACATED and RESET for 10/15/2019 at 01:30PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. All parties wishing to appear telephonically must coordinate a one-line conference call prior to calling the court. Once all parties are on the line, call (559) 499-5669 at the time of the hearing. Minute order signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 09/17/2019. (Gonzales, V)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION to DISMISS, MOTION to STRIKE ( Motion Hearing set for 10/11/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe.) by Mark Adams, California Receivership Group. Attorney Adams, Andrew Fitzgerald added. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mark Adams, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Proof of Service)(Adams, Andrew)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint to Extend Time to Respond by Mariposa County. Attorney Fujii, John Mamoru added. (Fujii, John)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER (TEXT Only): Parties wishing to appear telephonically at the SCHEDULING CONFERENCE currently set for Tuesday, November 12, 2019 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe may do so with each party using the following dial-in number and passcode: dial-in number 1-877-411-9748; passcode 3190866. Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/20/2019. (Valdez, E)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 11/12/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 VDRP) (Martin-Gill, S)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Mark Adams, California Receivership Group, Ashley Harris, Mariposa County, Mariposa County Sheriff's Office, Sheriff Deputy Wesley Smith, Sheriff Deputy William Atkinson* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Kenneth N. Frucht* *Geonetta & Frucht, LLP* *825 Washington Street, Suite 220* *Oakland, CA 94607*. (Martin-Gill, S)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Jerry Cox. Attorney Frucht, Kenneth N. added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8403239) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Frucht, Kenneth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jerry Cox v. Mariposa County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Deputy Wesley Smith
Represented By: John Mamoru Fujii
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Adams
Represented By: Andrew Fitzgerald Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Deputy William Atkinson
Represented By: John Mamoru Fujii
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mariposa County
Represented By: John Mamoru Fujii
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashley Harris
Represented By: AnnaMarie H. Van Hoesen
Represented By: Anthony M. Basich
Represented By: Amy Egerton-Wiley
Represented By: Brian Adesman
Represented By: Edward Crouse
Represented By: Jenna Conwisar
Represented By: Julia K Hirata
Represented By: Madeline P. Skitzki
Represented By: Nayiri K. Pilikyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mariposa County Sheriff's Office
Represented By: John Mamoru Fujii
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Receivership Group
Represented By: Andrew Fitzgerald Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Cox
Represented By: Frederick J. Geonetta
Represented By: Kenneth N. Frucht
Represented By: Kenneth Frucht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?