(SS) Gonzales v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Jasmine Monique Gonzales
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2019cv01128
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Boone
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:402
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2020 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Jasmine Monique Gonzales. (Pena, Jonathan)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER RE STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: Plaintiff shall serve her confidential letter brief on or before March 20, 2020; Defendants confidential letter brier shall be served on or before April 20, 2020; Plaintiffs opening brief shall be filed on or before May 20, 2020; Defendants responsive brief shall be filed on or before June 19, 2020; and Plaintiffs reply, if any, shall be filed on or before July 7, 2020.Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/20/2020. (Hernandez, M)
February 20, 2020 Filing 13 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time to File Plaintiffs Letter Brief by Jasmine Monique Gonzales. (Pena, Jonathan)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER on STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/17/2020. (Apodaca, P)
January 17, 2020 Filing 11 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time to File Plaintiffs Letter Brief by Jasmine Monique Gonzales. (Pena, Jonathan)
December 20, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF LODGING SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATIVE TRANSCRIPT by Commissioner of Social Security. Attorney Lodge, Jeffrey James added. In Electronic Format (Attachments: #1 Certification Page, #2 Court Transcript Index, #3 Documents Related to Administrative Process, #4 Payment Documents, #5 Jurisdictional Documents Part 1, #6 Jurisdictional Documents Part 2, #7 Non Disability Related Development, #8 Disability Related Development Part 1, #9 Disability Related Development Part 2, #10 Disability Related Development Part 3, #11 Disability Related Development Part 4, #12 Disability Related Development Part 5, #13 Medical Records Part 1, #14 Medical Records Part 2, #15 Medical Records Part 3, #16 Medical Records Part 4, #17 Medical Records Part 5, #18 Medical Records Part 6, #19 Medical Records Part 7, #20 Medical Records Part 8)(Lodge, Jeffrey)
September 12, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Commissioner of Social Security served on 8/28/2019, answer due 10/28/2019. (Gonzalez, R)
September 3, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Commissioner of Social Security. Attorney Lehrkind, Margaret added. (Lehrkind, Margaret)
August 22, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF SUBMITTING SERVICE DOCUMENTS to the U.S. Marshal by Jasmine Monique Gonzales pursuant to order of the court. (Pena, Jonathan)
August 22, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Jasmine Monique Gonzales. (Pena, Jonathan)
August 22, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Commissioner of Social Security* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Jonathan Omar Pena* *Pena & Bromberg, Attorneys at Law* *2440 Tulare St., Suite 320* *Fresno, CA 93721*. (Marrujo, C)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING ORDER and ORDER RE CONSENT in SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL; Consent or Decline due by 11/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 Consent Form, #3 USM Social Security Instructions) (Marrujo, C)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP and DIRECTING Clerk of Court to Issue Summons, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/19/19. (Marrujo, C)
August 16, 2019 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Action Required. (Lundstrom, T)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Jasmine Monique Gonzales. (Attachments: #1 IFP Motion)(Pena, Jonathan)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security by Jasmine Monique Gonzales. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pena, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (SS) Gonzales v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Margaret Lehrkind
Represented By: Jeffrey James Lodge, ss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jasmine Monique Gonzales
Represented By: Jonathan Omar Pena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?