Verdin v. Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc., et al.
Plaintiff: Adriana Verdin
Defendant: Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc. and Downs North Bakersfield, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01129
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J O'Neill
Referring Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 15:2301
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER by Downs North Bakersfield, Inc..(Prudian, Gary)
August 23, 2019 Filing 5 STIPULATION re #1 Notice of Removal, to extend time to respond to amended complaint by not more than 30 days by Downs North Bakersfield, Inc.. Attorney Prudian, Gary Haroutoin added. (Prudian, Gary)
August 22, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc..(Skanes, Mark)
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 11/13/2019 at 09:00 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 JLT Worksheet, #3 Consent Form, #4 VDRP) (Lundstrom, T)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc.. (Skanes, Mark)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Kern County Superior Court, case number BCV-19-101910 by Adriana Verdin. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8411305) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A_Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit B_Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit C_Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Skanes, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Verdin v. Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Michael John Gregg
Represented By: Mark William Skanes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Downs North Bakersfield, Inc.
Represented By: Gary Haroutoin Prudian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adriana Verdin
Represented By: Amy Lynn Bennecoff Ginsburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?