Cannell v. The People of the State of Utah et al
Plaintiff: Thomas A. Cannell, IV
Defendant: Apple Computer, Inc., Jocelyn Anderson Jobs and The People of the State of Utah
Case Number: 1:2019cv01154
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
Presiding Judge: Barbara A McAuliffe
Referring Judge: Lawrence J O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Order, Case Transferred Out to Another District, Terminate Civil Case, Terminate Deadlines and Hearings served on Thomas A. Cannell, IV. (Martin-Gill, S)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER, CASE TRANSFERRED to Northern District of CA, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/10/2019. CASE CLOSED(Martin-Gill, S)
September 16, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Thomas A. Cannell, IV. (Sant Agata, S)
August 29, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Order, served on Thomas A. Cannell, IV. (Martin-Gill, S)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER to Submit Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis or Pay $400.00 Filing Fee within Thirty Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/28/2019.(Motion for IFP or Filing Fee due: 30-Day Deadline) (Attachments: #1 IFP Application -Prisoner)(Martin-Gill, S)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to APPOINT COUNSEL by Thomas A. Cannell, IV. (Flores, E)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Apple Computer, Inc., Jocelyn Anderson Jobs, The People of the State of Utah by Thomas A. Cannell, IV. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Flores, E)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cannell v. The People of the State of Utah et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Computer, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jocelyn Anderson Jobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The People of the State of Utah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas A. Cannell, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?