West Coast Tires & Auto Center LLC et al v. Naveed et al
Plaintiff: West Coast Tires & Auto Center LLC and Ibrahim Alwareeth
Defendant: George Zarounian, Mohammad Naveed and Gary Zarounian
Case Number: 1:2019cv01165
Filed: August 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Boone
Referring Judge: Dale A Drozd
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Filing 17 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to *Mohammad Naveed* (Gonzalez, R)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Directing the Clerk of the Court to Terminate George Zarounian as a Party in this Action signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/11/2019. (Flores, E)
October 10, 2019 Filing 15 PROPOSED ORDER re Request for Default by Ibrahim Alwareeth, West Coast Tires & Auto Center LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Lovegren-Tipton, Amy)
October 10, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Ibrahim Alwareeth, West Coast Tires & Auto Center LLC. (Lovegren-Tipton, Amy)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER RE STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANT GARY ZAROUNIAN TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT, ORDER REQUIRING PLAINTIFFS TO FILE STATUS REPORT RE DEFENDANT MOHAMMAD NAVEED WITHIN 5 DAYS, ORDER CONTINUING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. The mandatory scheduling conference is CONTINUED from November 14, 2019 to January 14, 2020, at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 9; The parties shall file a joint scheduling report at least seven (7) calendar days prior to the continued scheduling conference date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/8/2019. (Hernandez, M)
October 8, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Second Extension of Time for Gary Zarounian to Respond to Complaint by Gary Zarounian. (Miller, Mark)
September 13, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Gary Zarounian to Respond to Complaint (LR 144(a)) by Gary Zarounian. Attorney Miller, Mark D. added. (Miller, Mark)
September 12, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Mohammad Naveed served on 9/4/2019, answer due 9/25/2019. (Lovegren-Tipton, Amy)
September 6, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Gary Zarounian served on 8/30/2019, answer due 9/20/2019. (Lovegren-Tipton, Amy)
August 28, 2019 Filing 8 TRADEMARK NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED as to Trademark #1:* 4934352 * * 04/05/16 * * WESTCOAST * ; copy of Complaint and Trademark Report emailed to U.S. Office of Patents and Trademarks. Initial Scheduling Conference set for 11/14/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 Trademark Report, #4 VDRP) (Gonzalez, R)
August 28, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE of DOCKET CORRECTION re #6 Civil New Case Documents for DAD : Please disregard, incorrect documents issued, corrected documents to follow. (Gonzalez, R)
August 28, 2019 Filing 6 ***Disregard, See 7 *** CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 11/14/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Gonzalez, R)
August 27, 2019 Filing 5 DECLARATION of Doe Designation No. 1. (Lovegren-Tipton, Amy)
August 27, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Mohammad Naveed, George Zarounian* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Amy Lovegren-Tipton* *Law Office Of Amy R. Lovegren-Tipton* *5703 N. West Ave Suite 103* *Fresno, CA 93711*. (Gonzalez, R)
August 26, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Ibrahim Alwareeth (Lovegren-Tipton, Amy)
August 26, 2019 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE to Attorney Amy Lovegren-Tipton: Under Local Rule 200, every complaint, amended complaint, or other document initiating a civil action shall be accompanied by a completed civil cover sheet, on a form available from the Clerk and on the Court's website. Please file your civil cover sheet. If you need assistance, please contact the CM/ECF help desk at 866-884-5444, or refer to the CM/ECF User's Manual on the court's website. (Jessen, A)
August 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages against All Plaintiffs by West Coast Tires & Auto Center LLC. Attorney Lovegren-Tipton, Amy added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8424984) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A and B)(Lovegren-Tipton, Amy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: West Coast Tires & Auto Center LLC et al v. Naveed et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: West Coast Tires & Auto Center LLC
Represented By: Amy Lovegren-Tipton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ibrahim Alwareeth
Represented By: Amy Lovegren-Tipton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Zarounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mohammad Naveed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Zarounian
Represented By: Mark D. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?