Howell v. Cook et al
Plaintiff: Kareem J. Howell
Defendant: Kevin Cook, Keith Fagundes and Steven Nguyen
Case Number: 1:2019cv01180
Filed: August 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Anthony W Ishii
Referring Judge: Sheila K Oberto
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2019 Filing 5 RESPONSE to #4 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE by Kareem J. Howell. (Orozco, A)
October 9, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order to Show Cause served on Kareem J. Howell. (Kusamura, W)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE WHY CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE AND FAILURE TO OBEY COURT ORDERS, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 10/9/2019. (Kusamura, W)
September 4, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Order served on Kareem J. Howell. (Kusamura, W)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT PRISONER'S TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 9/3/2019. (Kusamura, W)
August 29, 2019 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Action Required. (Gonzalez, R)
August 28, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Kareem J. Howell. (Gonzalez, R)
August 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kevin Cook, Keith Fagundes, Steven Nguyen by Kareem J. Howell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gonzalez, R)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Howell v. Cook et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Fagundes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kareem J. Howell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?