Christian Brink et al v. Central Valley Auto Transport, Inc.
Plaintiff: Christian Brink and David Maier
Defendant: Central Valley Auto Transport, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01213
Filed: August 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Anthony W Ishii
Referring Judge: Sheila K Oberto
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Central Valley Auto Transport, Inc. (Franco Chavez, Olivia)
September 4, 2019 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE: Attn: Olivia Franco Chavez ****** Civil Cover Sheet*******Under Local Rule 200, every complaint, amended complaint, or other document initiating a civil action shall be accompanied by a completed civil cover sheet, on a form available from the Clerk and on the Court's website. Please file your civil cover sheet. If you need assistance, please contact the CM/ECF help desk at 866-884-5444, or refer to the CM/ECF User's Manual on the court's website.(Martin-Gill, S)
September 4, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 12/12/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Martin-Gill, S)
September 3, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Central Valley Auto Transport, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal,. (Franco Chavez, Olivia)
August 30, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Tulare County Superior Court, case number VCU274266 by Christian Brink, David Maier. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8437576) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Declaration)(Franco Chavez, Olivia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Christian Brink et al v. Central Valley Auto Transport, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christian Brink
Represented By: Jamie Kathryn Serb
Represented By: David Thomas Mara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Maier
Represented By: Jamie Kathryn Serb
Represented By: David Thomas Mara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Valley Auto Transport, Inc.
Represented By: Olivia Vanessa Franco Chavez
Represented By: David J Cooper
Represented By: Mayra G. Estrada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?