Crescenciano Garcia v. Wine Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Crescenciano Garcia
Defendant: Wine Group, Inc. and Wine Group, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv01222
Filed: September 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale A Drozd
Referring Judge: Jeremy D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER: (TIME CHANGE ONLY) signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/31/2019; #5 Motion to Remand on calendar 11/5/2019, WILL BE HEARD at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. The parties are encouraged to appear telephonically and may do so by dialing 877-402-9757 (access code 6966236) at the time of the hearing. Because the court may be hearing other matters using the same conference line, please wait to state your appearance until your case has been called and appearances are requested. Keep all background noise to a minimum. Use of any feature(s) that may have an impact upon the quality of voice transmission (such as speakerphones, headsets, etc.) are prohibited; use of a land line or hand-held cell phone is required. At least 24 hours prior to the hearing, if you have not already done so, you must email Courtroom Deputy Jami Thorp, at JThorp@caed.uscourts.gov, to advise the court you will be appearing telephonically. (Thorp, J)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 REPLY by Crescenciano Garcia re #6 Opposition to Motion. (Brooks, Michael)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 OPPOSITION by Wine Group, Inc., Wine Group, LLC to #5 Motion to Remand. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of M. Donich in Support of Defendants' Opposition)(Morris, Keahn)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION to REMAND by Crescenciano Garcia. Motion Hearing set for 11/5/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Brooks, Michael)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Wine Group, Inc., Wine Group, LLC. (Morris, Keahn)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 11/22/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JDP) before Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson. (Attachments: #1 JDP Sched Conf, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Martin-Gill, S)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendants The Wine Group LLC, The Wine Group, Inc.. (Morris, Keahn)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Fresno County Superior Court, case number 19CECG02624 by Crescenciano Garcia. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8442388) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration)(Morris, Keahn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crescenciano Garcia v. Wine Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wine Group, Inc.
Represented By: Susan Q Haines
Represented By: Jennifer G. Redmond
Represented By: Keahn Noble Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wine Group, LLC
Represented By: Susan Q Haines
Represented By: Jennifer G. Redmond
Represented By: Keahn Noble Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crescenciano Garcia
Represented By: Michael T Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?