(SS) Delgado v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Jorge Rodolpho Delgado
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2019cv01254
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Gary S Austin
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:402
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Commissioner of Social Security served on 9/24/2019, answer due 11/25/2019. (Flores, E)
September 30, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Commissioner of Social Security. Attorney Clark, Carol Sue added. (Clark, Carol)
September 23, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF SUBMITTING SERVICE DOCUMENTS to the U.S. Marshal by Jorge Rodolpho Delgado pursuant to order of the court. (Pena, Jonathan)
September 23, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Jorge Rodolpho Delgado. (Pena, Jonathan)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER and ORDER RE CONSENT in SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL. Consent or Decline due by 12/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 Consent Form, #3 USM SS Instructions) (Sant Agata, S)
September 19, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Commissioner of Social Security* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Jonathan Omar Pena* *2440 Tulare Street* *Suite 320* *Fresno, CA 93721*. (Sant Agata, S)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING #4 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 9/19/2019. (Sant Agata, S)
September 18, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Jorge Rodolpho Delgado. (Pena, Jonathan)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER: (TEXT ENTRY ONLY), signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 9/11/2019. The Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit (Doc. #2 ) was filed without Plaintiff's signature swearing to the truth and accuracy of the information. Plaintiff is directed to sign the affidavit and refile it to enable the case to proceed. (Rosales, O.)
September 10, 2019 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Action Required. (Sant Agata, S)
September 9, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Jorge Rodolpho Delgado. (Attachments: #1 IFP Motion)(Pena, Jonathan)
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security by Jorge Rodolpho Delgado. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pena, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (SS) Delgado v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Carol Sue Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jorge Rodolpho Delgado
Represented By: Jonathan Omar Pena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?