Alva, Jr v. Wells Fargo Bank
Plaintiff: Joaquin Alva, Jr
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank
Case Number: 1:2019cv01273
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J O'Neill
Referring Judge: Sheila K Oberto
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER: ***TEXT ENTRY ONLY*** The Court is in receipt of the parties' "Stipulation to Continue Mandatory Scheduling Conference" filed on October 3, 2019, (Doc. #8 ). Pursuant to the parties' stipulation, and for good cause shown, the Mandatory Scheduling Conference currently set for December 26, 2019, is CONTINUED to January 30, 2020, at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. The parties SHALL file their joint scheduling report by no later than January 23, 2020. Minute Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 10/2/2019. (Kusamura, W)
October 3, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Continue mandatory Scheduling Conference by Joaquin Alva, Jr. (Glugoski, John)
September 20, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Compliance with 28 U.S.C. section 1446(d) by Wells Fargo Bank re #1 Notice of Removal. (Porcaro, Jill)
September 16, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Wells Fargo Bank re #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #1 Notice of Removal, #3 Declaration, #4 Declaration. (Porcaro, Jill)
September 16, 2019 Filing 5 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 12/26/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Marrujo, C)
September 13, 2019 RECEIPT number 0972-8460529 for $400.00 paid by Jill A. Porcaro fbo Wells Fargo Bank paid on 09/13/19. (Marrujo, C)
September 13, 2019 Filing 4 DECLARATION of Diana Brandenburg re #1 Notice of Removal. (Porcaro, Jill)
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Jill A. Porcaro re #1 Notice of Removal. (Porcaro, Jill)
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank. (Porcaro, Jill)
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Tulare Superior Court, case number 279608 by Joaquin Alva, Jr. (PAID) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Certificate and Notice of Interested Parties)(Porcaro, Jill)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alva, Jr v. Wells Fargo Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joaquin Alva, Jr
Represented By: Matthew Righetti
Represented By: John James Glugoski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank
Represented By: Jill A. Porcaro
Represented By: Christian J. Rowley
Represented By: Robin Elizabeth Devaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?