(PC) Sosa v. CSATF Warden
Plaintiff: Jorge Luis Sosa
Defendant: CSATF Warden
Case Number: 1:2019cv01333
Filed: September 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Erica P Grosjean
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCREENING ORDER; ORDER for Plaintiff to: (1) NOTIFY the Court that he is Willing to Proceed Only on the Claims Found Cognizable by the Court Against Defendant Correctional Officer Housse and Does 1-3 for Violation of the Eighth Amendment for Excessive Force and Sexual Assault, as well as Retaliation in Violation of the First Amendment; (2) FILE a First Amended Complaint; or (3) NOTIFY the Court that he Wishes to Stand on his Complaint, Subject to this Court Issuing Finding and Recommendations to the District Judge Assigned to this Case; Thirty (30) Day Deadline signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 11/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint Form). (Orozco, A)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #9 Screening Order, served on Jorge Luis Sosa. (Orozco, A)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING #4 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 09/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application) (Flores, E)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #8 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Jorge Luis Sosa. (Flores, E)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 10/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Flores, E)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Northern; Case Number 3:19-cv-05692.
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Jorge Luis Sosa. (Flores, E)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Remark Case transferred to Eastern District of California (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2019) [Transferred from cand on 9/23/2019.]
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF TRANSFER (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 9/17/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/18/2019: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (tlS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from cand on 9/23/2019.]
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jorge Luis Sosa. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2019) [Transferred from cand on 9/23/2019.]
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Letter from Jorge Luis Sosa. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2019) [Transferred from cand on 9/23/2019.]
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Jorge Luis Sosa.. (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2019) [Transferred from cand on 9/23/2019.]
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CSATF Warden. Filed byJorge Luis Sosa. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Envelope)(amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2019) [Transferred from cand on 9/23/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Sosa v. CSATF Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSATF Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jorge Luis Sosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?