(PC) Cabrera v. Collins et al
Plaintiff: Demetrio Cabrera
Defendant: C. Ramirez, A Timmerman, G. Collins, J. Lomeli, J. Keister, P. Gallagher and C. White
Case Number: 1:2019cv01341
Filed: September 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
Presiding Judge: Sheila K Oberto
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS to CCI, P.O. Box 1906, Tehachapi, CA 93581 by Demetrio Cabrera. (Martin-Gill, S)
November 13, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Order Re Consent or Request for Reassignment served on Demetrio Cabrera. (Orozco, A)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SECOND ORDER RE CONSENT OR REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 11/13/2019. (Orozco, A)
October 9, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Demetrio Cabrera. (Orozco, A)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING #5 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 10/09/2019. (Attachments: #1 IFP) (Orozco, A)
September 26, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Demetrio Cabrera. (Flores, E)
September 25, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order served on Demetrio Cabrera. (Lundstrom, T)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER to submit application to proceed in forma pauperis or pay filing fee within 45-Days signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 9/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application). (Lundstrom, T)
September 25, 2019 Filing 3 DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: #2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider, served on Corcoran State Prison. (Orozco, A)
September 25, 2019 Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *9/24/2019*;Petitioner's Consent or Decline due within thirty (30) days. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 E-Filing Notice) (Orozco, A)
September 24, 2019 Filing 1 (1983) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against G. Collins, P. Gallagher, J. Keister, J. Lomeli, C. Ramirez, A Timmerman, C. White by Demetrio Cabrera. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (Orozco, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Cabrera v. Collins et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A Timmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Lomeli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Keister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. Gallagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Demetrio Cabrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?