(PC) Hackworth v. Arevalos et al
Plaintiff: Robert Hackworth
Defendant: E. Arevalos, J. Brainard, D. Stohl, M. Wright and B. Gamboa
Case Number: 1:2019cv01362
Filed: September 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Barbara A McAuliffe
Referring Judge: Lawrence J O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DENYING #11 Motion to Proceed IFP as moot signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/28/2019. (Lundstrom, T)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #12 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Robert Hackworth. (Lundstrom, T)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Robert Hackworth. (Jessen, A)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING #9 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 10/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 IFP) (Orozco, A)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #10 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Robert Hackworth. (Orozco, A)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Robert Hackworth. (Orozco, A)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 FIRST AMENDED PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Robert Hackworth. (Jessen, A)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PLAINTIFF'S DECLARATION for the Amended Complaint. (Jessen, A)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY) pursuant to Decline of Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge, this case has been assigned to Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill and Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. The new case number is: 1:19-cv-01362-LJO-BAM. (Gonzalez, R)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: 6 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case, served on Robert Hackworth. (Gonzalez, R)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Robert Hackworth. (Gonzalez, R)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER to submit Application to proceed In Forma Pauperis or pay Filing Fee within 45-Days signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application). (Lundstrom, T)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order served on Robert Hackworth. (Lundstrom, T)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: #2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider, served on Kern Valley State Prison. (Orozco, A)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *9/27/2019* Plaintiff's Consent or Decline due within thirty (30) days. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 E-Filing Notice) (Orozco, A)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 (1983) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against E. Arevalos, J. Brainard, B. Gamboa, D. Stohl, M. Wright by Robert Hackworth. (Orozco, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Hackworth v. Arevalos et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Arevalos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Brainard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Stohl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Gamboa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Hackworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?