(PC) Venson v. Knight
Plaintiff: Clifford A. Venson
Defendant: J. Knight
Case Number: 1:2019cv01400
Filed: October 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Sheila K Oberto
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Clifford A. Venson. (Orozco, A)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #6 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 10/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 IFP) (Orozco, A)
October 21, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Clifford A. Venson. (Orozco, A)
October 18, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Clifford A. Venson. (Gonzalez, R)
October 15, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order, served on Clifford A. Venson. (Marrujo, C)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER to Submit Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis OR Pay Filing Fee Within 45 Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 10/15/19. (Attachments: #1 IFP App & Instructions.Prisoner)(Marrujo, C)
October 8, 2019 Filing 3 DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: #2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on CCI. (Marrujo, C)
October 8, 2019 Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *10/7/2019*; Consent or Decline due by 11/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 E-Filing Notice) (Marrujo, C)
October 7, 2019 Filing 1 (1983) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against J. Knight by Clifford A. Venson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Marrujo, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Venson v. Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clifford A. Venson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?