Eide v. Biomet, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Eric Eide
Defendant: Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC, Alabama Medical Consultants, Inc., John Cuckler, MD, Biomet Inc, Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Biomet Manufacturing, LLC and John Cuckler
Case Number: 1:2019cv01411
Filed: October 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Erica P Grosjean
Referring Judge: Lawrence J O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Filing 68 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Theodore O'Reilly on behalf of Biomet Inc, Biomet Manufacturing, LLC, Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC. Attorney O'Reilly, Theodore added. (O'Reilly, Theodore)
October 8, 2019 Filing 67 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Karen Michell Firstenberg on behalf of Biomet Inc, Biomet Manufacturing, LLC, Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC. Attorney Firstenberg, Karen Michell added. (Firstenberg, Karen)
October 8, 2019 Filing 66 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Tarifa Belle Laddon on behalf of Biomet Inc, Biomet Manufacturing, LLC, Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC. Attorney Laddon, Tarifa Belle added. (Laddon, Tarifa)
October 7, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #65 Docket Annotation, #64 Civil New Case Documents for LJO served on Altom M Maglio PHV, Ilyas Sayeg PHV, Michele S Stephan PHV. (Marrujo, C)
October 7, 2019 Filing 65 CLERK'S NOTICE Attorneys Altom Maglio, Ilyas Sayeg, Michele Stephan, Erin Hanig, John LaDue, Adrienne Busby, Andrew Campbell, J. Joseph Tanner, Stephanie Russo, to submit Pro Hac Vice application to practice in the Eastern District of California. (Marrujo, C)
October 7, 2019 Filing 64 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 1/23/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Marrujo, C)
October 7, 2019 Filing 63 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Indiana Northern; Case Number 3:17-cv-00955.
September 24, 2019 NOTICE: On the court's own motion, Status Conference set for 10/7/19 is RESET to 11/12/2019 01:00 PM (EDT) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al. (dk) [Transferred from innd on 10/7/2019.]
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 FOURTH TRANSFER ORDER AND EXPLANATION TO RECEIVING COURTS . Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 9/18/19. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al. (dk) [Transferred from innd on 10/7/2019.]
August 21, 2019 Filing 61 NOTICE by Biomet Manufacturing LLC of Second Amended Joint Proposed Discovery Group 7 Remand Case List (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(Hanig, Erin) [Transferred from innd on 10/7/2019.]
August 8, 2019 Filing 60 STATUS CONFERENCE held on 8/8/2019 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty Navan Ward. Dft appeared by attys John Winter and Erin Hanig. Topics discussed included the status of discovery in Groups 8A and 8B, remand and transfer of Group 7 cases, and disposition of settled cases. Next status conference set for Monday, October 7, 2019 at 1:00 p.m. (EDT) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from innd on 10/7/2019.]
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 OPINION AND ORDER : Plaintiffs Executive Committees motion to modify future remand/transfer orders [Doc. No. 3767 ] is DENIED. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/7/19. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al. (dk) [Transferred from innd on 10/7/2019.]
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT STATUS CONFERENCE Call-in information for the status conference on August 8, 2019 at 9:30 a.m. (EST).. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/6/19. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from innd on 10/7/2019.]
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 57 AMENDED REMAND/TRANSFER SCHEDULE FOR DISCOVERY GROUPS 7 AND 8 This order sets forth the remand and/or transfer deadlines to applicable to Discovery Groups 7, 8A and B. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 7/2/19. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from innd on 10/7/2019.]
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 REMAND/TRANSFER SHCEDULE FOR DISCOVERY GROUPS 7 AND 8 This order sets forth the remand and/or transfer deadlines applicable to Discovery Groups 7, 8A, and 8B. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 6/26/2019. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from innd on 10/7/2019.]
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER : The status conference previously scheduled for July 18, 2019 is now RESET for Thursday, August 8, 2019, at 9:30 a.m. (E.D.T.) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 6/25/19. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al. (dk) [Transferred from innd on 10/7/2019.]
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER FOR MAY 9, 2019 STATUS CONFERENCE : Summary of topics discussed and action taken. Next status conference set for July 18, 2019 at 1:30 p.m. (EDT). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 5/9/19. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al. (dk) [Transferred from innd on 10/7/2019.]
May 9, 2019 Filing 53 STATUS CONFERENCE held on 5/9/2019 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty B. Fulmer. Dft appeared by attys E. Hanig, J. Winter. The court hears from the parties. Next Status Conference set for 7/18/2019 01:30 PM (EDT) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. Written memorandum to follow. (Court Reporter T. Gallucci.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al. (dk) [Transferred from innd on 10/7/2019.]
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT STATUS CONFERENCE Call-in information for the status conference on May 9, 2019 at 1:30 p.m. (EST).. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 5/7/19. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from innd on 10/7/2019.]
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER FOR MARCH 4, 2019 STATUS CONFERENCE Summary of topics discussed and action taken. Next status conference set for May 9, 2019 at 1:30 p.m. (EDT). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 3/4/19. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from innd on 10/7/2019.]
March 4, 2019 Filing 50 STATUS CONFERENCE held on 3/4/2019 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty B. Fulmer, N. Ward. Dft appeared by atty E. Hanig, J. Winter. The Court hears from parties. The next Status Conference is set for 5/9/2019 at 1:30 PM (EDT) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. Written memorandum to follow. (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from innd on 10/7/2019.]
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT STATUS CONFERENCE Call-in information for the Status Conference to be held on 3/4/2019 at 1:30 PM (EDT). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 2/27/19. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from innd on 10/7/2019.]
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 OPINION AND ORDER: DENYING #19 Motion to Vacate the May 2018 order dismissing defendants Dr. Cuckler and AMC. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 1/23/19. (jld) [Transferred from innd on 10/7/2019.]
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER FOR JANUARY 9, 2019 STATUS CONFERENCE Summary of topics discussed and action taken. Next status conference set for March 4, 2019 at 1:30 p.m. (EST). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 1/10/19. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from innd on 10/7/2019.]
January 10, 2019 Filing 46 STATUS CONFERENCE held on 1/9/2019 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty Navan Ward. Dft appeared by atty Erin Hanig, John Winter. Summary of topics discussed and action taken. Next status conference set for March 4, 2019 at 01:30 PM (EST) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) Modified on 1/11/2019 to correct date hearing held (jld). Modified on 2/1/2019 to correct date hearing held (dk). [Transferred from innd on 10/7/2019.]
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT STATUS CONFERENCE Call-in information for the status conference on January 9, 2019 at 1:15 p.m. (EST).. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 1/7/19. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from innd on 10/7/2019.]
November 19, 2018 Filing 44 STATUS CONFERENCE held on 11/15/2018 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty Brenda Fulmer. Dft appeared by atty John Winter, Erin Hanig. Topics discussed included status of discovery in Groups 6 and 7 and pending motions. Next status conference set for Wednesday, January 9, 2019 at 1:15 p.m. (EST) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) Modified on 12/13/2018 to correct date of hearing (jld). [Transferred from innd on 10/7/2019.]
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER ACTIVATING DISCOVERY GROUP 7 Identifies cases to be included in Group 7 for purposes of case-specific discovery and related deadlines. Completed and updated medical records authorizations to be provided to Biomet by 12/14/2018. Case-specific Discovery deadline is 7/12/2019. The parties are directed to confer and file a report within 90 days of the date of this order regarding management of all remaining cases. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 11-14-18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from innd on 10/7/2019.]
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER Concerning Remote Attendance at Status Conference; set for 11/15/2018 01:15 PM EST by telephone can join via conference call. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 11/9/2018. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(lpw) [Transferred from innd on 10/7/2019.]
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER The court GRANTS the parties' joint motion for an extension of time to submit the proposed Remand Group 2 case list (Doc. No. 3723 ) to/including 10/5/2018. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 10/1/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from innd on 10/7/2019.]
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER By agreement of the parties, the November 8 status conference is RESET for Thursday 11/15/2018 at 1:15 PM (EST) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr.. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 9/24/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from innd on 10/7/2019.]
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER FOR SEPTEMBER 19, 2018 STATUS CONFERENCE Summary of topics discussed and action taken. Next status conference set for November 8, 2018 at 1:15 p.m. (EST).. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 9/21/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from innd on 10/7/2019.]
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER The court GRANTS the defendants' 3178 Motion to add Attorneys J. Joseph Tanner, Adrienne Franco Busby, Andrew L. Campbell, and Stephanie N. Russo as Co-Liaison Counsel. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 9/19/2018. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from innd on 10/7/2019.]
September 19, 2018 Filing 33 STATUS CONFERENCE held on 9/19/2018 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty N. Ward and B. Fulmer (by phone). Dft appeared by atty E. Hanig, J. Winter, J. LaDue, J. Tanner (in person). The Court hears from parties. Written order to follow. The next Status Conference is set for 11/8/2018 at 1:15 PM (EDT) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from innd on 10/7/2019.]
September 18, 2018 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Adrienne Franco Busby on behalf of Biomet Inc, Biomet Orthopedics LLC. (ksc) [Transferred from innd on 10/7/2019.]
September 18, 2018 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie N Russo on behalf of Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Biomet, Inc.(ksc) [Transferred from innd on 10/7/2019.]
September 18, 2018 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew L Campbell on behalf of Biomet Inc, Biomet Orthopedics LLC. (ksc) [Transferred from innd on 10/7/2019.]
September 18, 2018 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by J Joseph Tanner on behalf of Biomet Inc, Biomet Orthopedics LLC. (ksc) [Transferred from innd on 10/7/2019.]
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT STATUS CONFERENCE Call-in information for the status conference on September 19, 2018 at 1:30 p.m. (E.D.T.). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 9/12/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from innd on 10/7/2019.]
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER OF TRANSFER UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) AND EXPLANATION TO RECEIVING COURTS Pursuant to the court's prior orders and 28 USC 1404(a), the Clerk of Court is ORDERED TO TRANSFER the cases listed on Exhibit A to the venues agreed upon by the parties and designated in the order. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 9/6/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from innd on 10/7/2019.]
September 6, 2018 Filing 30 SUGGESTION OF REMAND/EXPLANATION TO TRANSFEROR COURTS Pursuant to 28 USC 1407(a) and Panel Rule 10.1(b), the court suggests that the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation remand the cases listed in Exhibit A to the districts from which they were transferred. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 9/6/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) (A copy of this Order was emailed to the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on 9/6/2018) [Transferred from innd on 10/7/2019.]
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER VACATING DIRECT FILING PROVISION AND REQUESTING CESSATION OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFERS : Pursuant to the scheduling order issued on 4/23/18 Doc No. 3573 , the provisions in Section III of the 2/15/13 and 3/14/16 Case Mgmt Orders Doc. Nos. 242 and 3096 allowing direct filing in this Court are VACATED effective 9/1/18, and no direct filings will be allowed after that date. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/24/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al. (dk) [Transferred from innd on 10/7/2019.]
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER: The parties shall have to and including 8/31/18 to file any objections they may have to: (1) adding 3:13-CV-283, 3:13-CV-1017, 3:14-CV-1264, and 3:14-CV-1271 to the list of cases to be included in Remand Group 1, and (2) transferring all direct-filings to the jurisdictions identified in the proposed list and issuing a suggestion of remand in the cases listed above . Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/16/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al. (dk) [Transferred from innd on 10/7/2019.]
July 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER The Defendants' ( 3623 in 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG) Consent MOTION to reset Status Conference is GRANTED. The Status Conference is RESET 9/19/2018 at 1:30 PM (EDT) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 7/26/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from innd on 10/7/2019.]
July 18, 2018 Filing 26 TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 7/18/2018 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty A. Davis, N. Ward. Dft appeared by atty E. Hanig, J. LaDue, J. Winter. Topics discussed included status of Group 5 and 6 discovery, the proposed pretrial order on remand, upcoming expert video depositions, pro se cases and pending motions. Following discussion, the court directed plaintiff's counsel to file any motion to enforce settlement in Simpson v. Biomet, 3:16cv466, by Aug 9, 2018. Next status conference set for Aug 27, 2018 at 1:30 p.m. (EDT) before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from innd on 10/7/2019.]
July 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Remote Attendance Order for July 18, 2018 Status Conference Call in information for the hearing on 7/18/2018 at 1:30 PM (EDT). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 7/12/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from innd on 10/7/2019.]
June 13, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Michele S Stephan PHV on behalf of Eric Eide (Stephan PHV, Michele) [Transferred from innd on 10/7/2019.]
May 29, 2018 Filing 23 Docket Annotation: The Dismissal Order entered on 5/29/2018 related to only three member cases, but was inadvertently docketed in all pending member cases. To avoid confusion and correct the error, the original entry [Doc. No. 3593 ] was deleted from the master and all member case dockets, and the order was redocketed in 3:12md2391 [Doc. No. 3596 ] and the related member cases (3:13cv1243, 3:14cv1243, and 3:16cv170).Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from innd on 10/7/2019.]
May 22, 2018 Filing 22 RESPONSE to Motion re #19 MOTION to Vacate #18 Opinion and Order, Add and Terminate Parties, Terminate Motions, #15 Memorandum in Support filed by Alabama Medical Consultants, Inc., John Cuckler, MD. (Hanig, Erin) [Transferred from innd on 10/7/2019.]
May 17, 2018 Filing 21 STATUS CONFERENCE held on 5/17/2018 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty Brenda Fulmer. Dft appeared by atty John Winter and John LaDue. The Court hears from parties. A Status Conference is set for 7/18/2018 at 1:30 PM (EST) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. (Court Reporter J. Hoffman.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from innd on 10/7/2019.]
May 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT STATUS CONFERENCE Call-in information for the May 17, 2018 status conference.. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 5/9/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from innd on 10/7/2019.]
May 8, 2018 Filing 19 MOTION to Vacate #18 Opinion and Order, Add and Terminate Parties, Terminate Motions, #15 Memorandum in Support by Plaintiff Eric Eide. (Maglio PHV, Altom) [Transferred from innd on 10/7/2019.]
May 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING #14 MOTION to Dismiss filed by John Cuckler, MD, Alabama Medical Consultants, Inc. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 5/7/18. (ksp) [Transferred from innd on 10/7/2019.]
April 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER - This order activates Group 6 (Exh. A) for case specific discovery purposes and establishes deadlines for winding up the MDL proceedings. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 4/23/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(ksc) [Transferred from innd on 10/7/2019.]
April 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING 3560 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Parties given to and including April 11, 2018 to file the joint proposed scheduling order. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 4/10/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from innd on 10/7/2019.]
April 9, 2018 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Support of #14 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Alabama Medical Consultants, Inc., John Cuckler, MD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hanig, Erin) [Transferred from innd on 10/7/2019.]
April 9, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Alabama Medical Consultants, Inc., John Cuckler, MD. (Hanig, Erin) [Transferred from innd on 10/7/2019.]
April 9, 2018 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Alabama Medical Consultants, Inc., Biomet Manufacturing, LLC, Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC, Biomet, Inc., John Cuckler, MD.(Hanig, Erin) [Transferred from innd on 10/7/2019.]
March 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER By agreement of the parties, the court established deadlines and a schedule for briefing summary judgment motions in the cases identified in Exhibits A, B, and C to this order. See order for details.. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 3/29/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from innd on 10/7/2019.]
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING IN PART Plaintiffs Steering Committee's request to take video depositions of its generic expert witnesses, and DIRECTING parties to submit proposed agreed scheduling order by April 9, 2018. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 3/26/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from innd on 10/7/2019.]
March 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER FOR MARCH 12, 2018 STATUS CONFERENCE Summary of topics discussed and action taken. Next status conference set for Thursday, May 17, 2018 at 1:00 p.m. (EDT).. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 3/14/2018. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from innd on 10/7/2019.]
March 12, 2018 Filing 9 STATUS CONFERENCE held on 3/12/2018 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by attys Jasper Ward (in person), Brenda Fulmer and Ahmad Diab (by phone). Dft appeared by attys Erin Hanig, John LaDue, and John Winter (all in person). The Court hears from parties. Status Conference set for 5/17/2018 at 1:00 PM (EDT) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. Written order to follow.(Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from innd on 10/7/2019.]
February 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 OPINION AND ORDER Biomets 3388 motions for summary judgment related to the Taper, ReCap, and metal-on-polyethylene devices is DENIED on the merits; Biomets 3390 motions for summary judgment relating to the state-of-the-art defense is DENIED, without prejudice; If the plaintiffs in White v. Biomet (3:16cv115) and Glynn v. Biomet (3:15cv491) wish to take device-specific expert depositions, they should file a motion to that effect within 14 days from the date of this order, and should indicate in that motion whether local counsel will conduct the deposition, with or without the assistance of the Plaintiffs Steering Committee. The plaintiffs in the Price v. Biomet (3:14cv275) and Gearon v. Biomet (3:14cv2099) shall have 14 days from the date of this order to file a motion to amend the scheduling order to allow device-specific expert depositions or, alternatively, a motion for suggestion of remand. If they elect the later, the Plaintiffs Steering Committee should address the effect, if any, remand would have on the plaintiffs obligations under the December 7,2015 Amended Holdback Order 3022 in its response. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 2/8/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from innd on 10/7/2019.]
February 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER FOR JANUARY 30, 2018 STATUS CONFERENCE Summary of the topics discussed and actions taken. The next Status Conference is set for 3/12/2018 at 1:30 PM (EDT)in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr.. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 2/1/18. (Copy mailed to pro se parties)Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from innd on 10/7/2019.]
January 30, 2018 Filing 6 TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE held on 1/30/2018 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty Brenda Fulmer (in person), Ahmed Diab and Justin Presnal (by phone). Dft appeared by atty Erin Linder and John LaDue (in person), John Winter (by phone). The next Status Conference is set for 3/12/2018 at 1:30 PM (EDT) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. Written order to follow.(Court Reporter Debra Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from innd on 10/7/2019.]
January 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Remote Attendance Order for January 30, 2018 Telephonic Status Conference Call-in information for the telephonic status conference on January 30, 2018 at 1:30 pm (EDT).. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 1/25/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from innd on 10/7/2019.]
December 22, 2017 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin Linder Hanig on behalf of Alabama Medical Consultants, Inc., Biomet Manufacturing, LLC, Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC, Biomet, Inc., John Cuckler, MD (Hanig, Erin) [Transferred from innd on 10/7/2019.]
December 22, 2017 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by John D LaDue on behalf of Alabama Medical Consultants, Inc., Biomet Manufacturing, LLC, Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC, Biomet, Inc., John Cuckler, MD (LaDue, John) [Transferred from innd on 10/7/2019.]
December 22, 2017 Judge Robert L Miller, Jr and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. (NEW CASE) (jld) [Transferred from innd on 10/7/2019.]
December 21, 2017 Filing 4 OPINION AND ORDER DENYING 3381 Executive Committee's motion to exclude opinions and testimony of Biomet's expert Steven R. Schmid; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 3382 the Executive Committee's motion to exclude opinions and testimony of Biomet expert David Schroeder; DENYING 3383 the Executive Committee's motion to exclude opinions and testimony of Biomet's expert Daniel Schultz, M.D.; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 3384 the Executive Committee's motion to exclude opinions and testimony of Biomet's expert Andrew I Spitzer, M.D.; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 3385 the Executive Committee's Motion to exclude opinions and testimony of Biomet's expert Dr. Kenneth St. John; DENYING 3386 Biomet's motion to exclude opinions and testimony of the plaintiffs' expert Mari Truman; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 3399 Biomet's motion to exclude opinions and testimony of the plaintiffs' expert George S Kantor, M.D. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from innd on 10/7/2019.]
December 21, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3442881.), filed by Eric Eide. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sayeg PHV, Ilyas) [Transferred from innd on 10/7/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eide v. Biomet, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Eide
Represented By: Ilyas Sayeg PHV
Represented By: Altom M Maglio PHV
Represented By: Michele S Stephan PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC
Represented By: John D LaDue, PHV
Represented By: Erin Linder Hanig, PHV
Represented By: Theodore O'Reilly
Represented By: Karen Michell Firstenberg
Represented By: Tarifa Belle Laddon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alabama Medical Consultants, Inc.
Represented By: John D LaDue, PHV
Represented By: Erin Linder Hanig, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Cuckler, MD
Represented By: John D LaDue, PHV
Represented By: Erin Linder Hanig, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biomet Inc
Represented By: John D LaDue, PHV
Represented By: Erin Linder Hanig, PHV
Represented By: J. Joseph Tanner, PHV
Represented By: Adrienne Franco Busby, PHV
Represented By: Andrew L. Campbell, PHV
Represented By: Stephanie N Russo, PHV
Represented By: Theodore O'Reilly
Represented By: Karen Michell Firstenberg
Represented By: Tarifa Belle Laddon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biomet Orthopedics, LLC
Represented By: John D LaDue, PHV
Represented By: Erin Linder Hanig, PHV
Represented By: J. Joseph Tanner, PHV
Represented By: Adrienne Franco Busby, PHV
Represented By: Andrew L. Campbell, PHV
Represented By: Stephanie N Russo, PHV
Represented By: Theodore O'Reilly
Represented By: Karen Michell Firstenberg
Represented By: Tarifa Belle Laddon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biomet Manufacturing, LLC
Represented By: John D LaDue, PHV
Represented By: Erin Linder Hanig, PHV
Represented By: Theodore O'Reilly
Represented By: Karen Michell Firstenberg
Represented By: Tarifa Belle Laddon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Cuckler
Represented By: John D LaDue, PHV
Represented By: Erin Linder Hanig, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?