(PC) Sims v. Castro et al
Plaintiff: Carlton Sims, Sr.
Defendant: J. Quintana, J. Castro and E. Merida
Case Number: 1:2019cv01427
Filed: October 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Boone
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: 9 Notice - Other, served on Carlton Sims Sr.. (Plummer, M)
October 11, 2019 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE: (TEXT ONLY): U.S. District Judge Dale A. Drozd was assigned to this case due to clerical error and should be disregarded. Case randomly assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. The new case number is 1:19-cv-1427 SAB (PC) (Plummer, M)
October 11, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #8 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Carlton Sims Sr.. (Plummer, M)
October 11, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 11/15/2019 (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Plummer, M)
October 10, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Order and #7 Prisoner New Case Documents served on Carlton Sims Sr. (Henshaw, R)
October 10, 2019 Filing 7 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *10/4/2019*; Consent or Decline due by 11/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 E-Filing Notice) (Henshaw, R)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER of INTRADISTRICT TRANSFER from Sacramento (2:19-cv-2007 KJN) to Fresno (1:19-cv-1427 SAB) signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/10/2019. (Henshaw, R)
October 10, 2019 Filing 5 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Carlton Sims, Sr. (Benson, A.)
October 9, 2019 RESERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Carlton Sims Sr. [with CDCR #] (Donati, J)
October 8, 2019 Filing 4 CLERKS NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for Carlton Sims, Sr, CDC AN-4131 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsSacramento@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (TEXT ONLY) (Plummer, M)
October 7, 2019 SERVICE BY EMAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Carlton Sims Sr.. (Tupolo, A)
October 7, 2019 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *10/4/2019*; Consent or Decline due by 11/12/2019 (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 E-Filing Notice) (Tupolo, A)
October 4, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Carlton Sims, Sr. (Tupolo, A) Modified on 10/8/2019 (Plummer, M).
October 4, 2019 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against J. Castro, E Merida, J Quintana by Carlton Sims, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Tupolo, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Sims v. Castro et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlton Sims, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Quintana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Merida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?