Patrick Warnshuis v. Amazon.Com, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Patrick Warnshuis
Defendant: Amazon.Com, Inc., Bausch Health US, LLC, Amazon Services LLC, Valeant Pharmaceuticals North America, LLC and Product Quest Manufacturing, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv01454
Filed: October 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Anthony W Ishii
Referring Judge: Barbara A McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER by Amazon Services LLC, Amazon.Com, Inc..(Rothman, Max)
October 21, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION TO EXTEND AMAZON.COM, INC. AND AMAZON SERVICES LLC TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Amazon Services LLC, Amazon.Com, Inc.. (Rothman, Max)
October 17, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Patrick Warnshuis. (Stirrup, Adam)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER (TEXT Only): Parties wishing to appear telephonically at the SCHEDULING CONFERENCE currently set for Tuesday, January 14, 2020 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe may do so with each party using the following dial-in number and passcode: dial-in number 1-877-411-9748; passcode 3190866. Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/17/2019. (Valdez, E)
October 17, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Amazon Services LLC, Amazon.Com, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal. Attorney Rothman, Max L. added. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Rothman, Max)
October 16, 2019 Filing 5 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 1/14/2020 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Martin-Gill, S)
October 15, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Amazon Services LLC. (Hussey, Julie)
October 15, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Amazon.Com, Inc.. (Hussey, Julie)
October 15, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Amazon Services LLC, Amazon.Com, Inc. (Hussey, Julie)
October 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Superior Court of State of California for the County of Fresno, case number 19CECG03351 by Patrick Warnshuis. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8515016) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Hussey, Julie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patrick Warnshuis v. Amazon.Com, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Warnshuis
Represented By: Adam B. Stirrup
Represented By: Warren Robin Paboojian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.Com, Inc.
Represented By: Julie LeMaye Hussey
Represented By: Max L. Rothman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bausch Health US, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon Services LLC
Represented By: Julie LeMaye Hussey
Represented By: Max L. Rothman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valeant Pharmaceuticals North America, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Product Quest Manufacturing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?