Flores v. County of Fresno et al
Plaintiff: Clarissa Flores
Defendant: Obadina, M.D., Sheriff Margaret Mims, Laura, R.N., Corizon Health, Inc., Newell, M.D. and County of Fresno
Case Number: 1:2019cv01477
Filed: October 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale A Drozd
Referring Judge: Barbara A McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER: (TIME CHANGE ONLY) signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 12/12/2019; #6 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings on calendar 12/17/2019, WILL BE HEARD at 11:15 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. The parties are encouraged to appear telephonically and may do so by dialing 877-402-9757 (access code 6966236) at the time of the hearing. Because the court may be hearing other matters using the same conference line, please wait to state your appearance until your case has been called and appearances are requested. Keep all background noise to a minimum. Use of any feature(s) that may have an impact upon the quality of voice transmission (such as speakerphones, headsets, etc.) are prohibited; use of a land line or hand-held cell phone is required. At least 24 hours prior to the hearing, if you have not already done so, you must email Courtroom Deputy Jami Thorp, at JThorp@caed.uscourts.gov, to advise the court you will be appearing telephonically. (Thorp, J)
December 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 REPLY by Corizon Health, Inc. to RESPONSE to #6 Motion for Judgment. (Grigg, Matthew)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 OPPOSITION by Clarissa Flores to #6 Motion for Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition)(Chandler, Stuart)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER: (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 11/1/2019. The #6 Motion for Judgment currently noticed for 12/10/2019 is CONTINUED to 12/17/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Thorp, J)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for JUDGMENT on the Pleadings by Corizon Health, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 12/10/2019 at 09:30 AM before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Grigg, Matthew)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER (TEXT Only): Parties wishing to appear telephonically at the SCHEDULING CONFERENCE currently set for Thursday, January 16, 2020 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe may do so with each party using the following dial-in number and passcode: dial-in number 1-877-411-9748; passcode 3190866. Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/23/2019. (Valdez, E)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Corizon Health, Inc.. Attorney Grigg, Matthew Marvin added. (Grigg, Matthew)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 1/16/2020 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Jessen, A)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE to Attorney James Weakley re #1 Notice of Removal: Advance payment of the filing fee in the amount of $400.00 is required and should be submitted electronically using the event New Case Credit Card Payments. Your case will not be filed until the fee is paid (Local Rule 77-121c). If you wish to pay with cash, check or money order, the fee must be received by the clerk's office within 48 hours of lodging your complaint, or your documents will be deleted from the court's server. If you need assistance, please contact the CM/ECF help desk at 866-884-5444, or refer to theCM/ECF User's Manual on the court's website. (Sant Agata, S)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order PAYMENT for Civil Case filing fee in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0972-8522798. (Weakley, James)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order RECEIPT number 0972-8522798 for $400.00 for County of Fresno, et al. from James D. Weakley. (Sant Agata, S)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Superior Court of California, County of Fresno, case number 19CECG02070 by Clarissa Flores. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James D. Weakley in Support of Removal of Action [28 U.S.C. Section 1441(a)], #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Weakley, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flores v. County of Fresno et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Obadina, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Margaret Mims
Represented By: James D. Weakley
Represented By: Ashley N. Reyes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura, R.N.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corizon Health, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew M. Grigg
Represented By: Matthew Marvin Grigg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newell, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Fresno
Represented By: James D. Weakley
Represented By: Ashley N. Reyes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clarissa Flores
Represented By: Stuart Rowe Chandler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?