(HC) Lopez v. Fisher
Petitioner: Daniel Lopez
Respondent: Raythel Fisher, Jr.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01486
Filed: October 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jeremy D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Daniel Lopez. (Sant Agata, S)
October 22, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider, #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #4 Order Authorizing IFP Status, Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Daniel Lopez. (Marrujo, C)
October 22, 2019 Filing 5 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 11/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Marrujo, C)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER AUTHORIZING IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS as to Daniel Lopez, signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 10/22/19. (Marrujo, C)
October 21, 2019 Filing 3 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Daniel Lopez. (Marrujo, C)
October 21, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Daniel Lopez. (Marrujo, C)
October 21, 2019 Filing 1 (2254) PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against Raythel Fisher, Jr by Daniel Lopez.(Marrujo, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC) Lopez v. Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Raythel Fisher, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Daniel Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?