(PC) Bland v. Allen et al
Plaintiff: Joshua Davis Bland
Defendant: A. Lucas, C. Gonzales, M. Oliveira, D. Stebbins and K.J. Allen
Case Number: 1:2019cv01499
Filed: October 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
Presiding Judge: Erica P Grosjean
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2019 Filing 12 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Orozco, A)
November 20, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS to CALIFORNIA STATE PRISON, CORCORAN P.O. Box 3476 Corcoran, CA 93212 by Joshua Davis Bland. (Lundstrom, T)
November 7, 2019 RE-SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider, #5 Order, #8 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Joshua Davis Bland. (Gonzalez, R)
November 6, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS to P.O. BOX 290066, Represa, CA 95671 by Joshua Davis Bland. (Kaminski, H)
November 1, 2019 ADDRESS UPDATED to CSP-Sacramento PO Box 290066, Represa, CA 95671-0066 pursuant to Notice of Change of Address filed in 2:19-cv-02102-CKD on 11/1/19. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
November 1, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Joshua Davis Bland. (Jessen, A)
October 24, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #8 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Joshua Davis Bland. (Jessen, A)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 10/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 IFP Motion) (Jessen, A)
October 23, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider, #5 Order served on Joshua Davis Bland. (Plummer, M)
October 23, 2019 Filing 6 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 11/25/2019 (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Plummer, M)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for INTRADISTRICT TRANSFER from Sacramento (2:19-cv-2101 KJN) to Fresno (1:19-cv-1499 EPG) signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/23/19. (Plummer, M)
October 22, 2019 Filing 7 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Joshua Davis Bland (Kaminski, H)
October 21, 2019 Filing 4 CLERKS NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for Joshua Davis Bland, CDC P-29302 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsSacramento@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (TEXT ONLY) (Plummer, M)
October 18, 2019 SERVICE BY EMAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Joshua Davis Bland. (Tupolo, A)
October 18, 2019 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *10/18/2019*; Consent or Decline due by 11/21/2019 (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 E-Filing Notice) (Tupolo, A)
October 18, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Joshua Davis Bland. (Tupolo, A) Modified on 10/21/2019 (Plummer, M).
October 18, 2019 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against K.J. Allen, C. Gonzales, A. Lucas, M. Oliveira, D. Stebbins by Joshua Davis Bland. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Tupolo, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Bland v. Allen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Lucas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Oliveira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Stebbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K.J. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Davis Bland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?