Tuggle, et al. v. City of Tulare, et al.
Plaintiff: Cameron Ware, Letitia Tuggle and Rosa Cuevas
Defendant: Matt Machado and City of Tulare
Counter Defendant: Ryan Garcia
Case Number: 1:2019cv01525
Filed: October 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Boone
Referring Judge: Lawrence J O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION to DISMISS by Rosa Cuevas, Letitia Tuggle (as Representative of The Estate of Quinntin Castro), Cameron Ware. Motion Hearing set for 2/3/2020 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cajina, Fulvio)
December 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL by All Plaintiffs. Attorney Cajina, Fulvio Francisco added. (Cajina, Fulvio)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ANSWER with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by City of Tulare, Matt Machado. Attorney Praet, Bruce Daniel added. by City of Tulare, Matt Machado. Attorney Praet, Bruce Daniel added. (Attachments: #1 Counter Claim, #2 3rd Party Summons Cuevas, #3 3rd Party Summons Tuggle, #4 3rd Party Summons Cameron Ware)(Praet, Bruce)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 1/10/2020 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Orozco, A)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *City of Tulare, Matt Machado* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Stanley Goff* *Law Office of Stanley Goff* *15 Boardman Place* *San Francisco, CA 94103*. (Orozco, A)
October 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Letitia Tuggle. Attorney Goff, Stanley added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8537156) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Goff, Stanley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tuggle, et al. v. City of Tulare, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt Machado
Represented By: Bruce Daniel Praet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Tulare
Represented By: Bruce Daniel Praet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cameron Ware
Represented By: Stanley Goff
Represented By: Fulvio Francisco Cajina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Letitia Tuggle
Represented By: Stanley Goff
Represented By: Fulvio Francisco Cajina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosa Cuevas
Represented By: Stanley Goff
Represented By: Fulvio Francisco Cajina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Ryan Garcia
Represented By: Bruce Daniel Praet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?