(PC) Potts v. Soleimani et al
Plaintiff: James E. Potts
Defendant: M. Soleimani and A. Youssef
Case Number: 1:2019cv01574
Filed: November 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Gary S Austin
Nature of Suit: Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2019 Filing 5 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Northern; Case Number 4:19-cv-06645.
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF TRANSFER by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2019) [Transferred from cand on 11/5/2019.]
October 16, 2019 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 11/25/2019. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2019) [Transferred from cand on 11/5/2019.]
October 16, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by James Edward Potts. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2019) Modified on 10/21/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from cand on 11/5/2019.]
October 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against M. Soleimani, A. Youssef. Filed by James Edward Potts. Consent/Declination due by 11/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2019) [Transferred from cand on 11/5/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Potts v. Soleimani et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Soleimani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Youssef
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James E. Potts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?