(SS) Clark v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Sarina Elaine Clark
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2019cv01587
Filed: November 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Gary S Austin
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:402
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Pena, Jonathan)
December 12, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF SUBMITTING SERVICE DOCUMENTS to the U.S. Marshal by Sarina Elaine Clark pursuant to order of the court. (Pena, Jonathan)
December 11, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Sarina Elaine Clark. Commissioner of Social Security served on 11/26/2019, answer due 1/27/2020. (Sant Agata, S)
December 11, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (McAdam, S.)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER and ORDER RE CONSENT in SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL: Consent or Decline due by 2/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 Consent Form, #3 USM Instructions) (Jessen, A)
November 21, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Commissioner of Social Security* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Jonathan Omar Pena* *Pena & Bromberg, Attorneys at Law* *2440 Tulare St., Suite 320* *Fresno, CA 93721*. (Jessen, A)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 11/12/2019. (Jessen, A)
November 6, 2019 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Action Required. (Orozco, A)
November 6, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Sarina Clark. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pena, Jonathan)
November 6, 2019 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security by Sarina Clark. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pena, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (SS) Clark v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarina Elaine Clark
Represented By: Jonathan Omar Pena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: S. Wyeth McAdam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?