(PC) Malone v. Aboytes
Plaintiff: Deshawn Malone
Defendant: J. Aboytes
Case Number: 1:2019cv01594
Filed: November 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Anthony W Ishii
Referring Judge: Sheila K Oberto
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2019 Filing 9 OBJECTIONS to FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS #8 by Plaintiff Deshawn Malone. (Jessen, A)
November 18, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #8 Findings and Recommendations (Motion), 7 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case served on Deshawn Malone. (Orozco, A)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Deny Plaintiff's #2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and Dismiss Action without Prejudice; ORDER DIRECTING Clerk of Court to Assign a District Judge; referred to Judge Anthony W. Ishii, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 11/18/2019. Objections to F&R due within Fourteen (14) Days.(Orozco, A)
November 18, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to District Judge Anthony W. Ishii and Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. The new case number is: 1:19-cv-01594-AWI-SKO (PC). (Orozco, A)
November 14, 2019 Filing 6 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Deshawn Malone (Lundstrom, T)
November 8, 2019 Filing 5 DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: New Case Documents served on Kern Valley State Prison. (Sant Agata, S)
November 8, 2019 Filing 4 CLERKS NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for Deshawn Malone, CDC E-78802 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsFresno@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Sant Agata, S)
November 8, 2019 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *11/7/2019*; Consent or Decline due by 12/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 E-Filing Notice) (Sant Agata, S)
November 8, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Deshawn Malone. (Sant Agata, S)
November 7, 2019 Filing 1 (1983) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against J. Aboytes by Deshawn Malone. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sant Agata, S)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Malone v. Aboytes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Aboytes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deshawn Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?