Professional Solutions Insurance Company v. Cardot et al
Plaintiff: Professional Solutions Insurance Company
Defendant: Coleman & Horowitt LLP and John M Cardot
Case Number: 1:2019cv01605
Filed: November 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Boone
Referring Judge: Lawrence J O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 Filing 6 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 2/18/2020 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Flores, E)
November 12, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *John M Cardot, Coleman & Horowitt LLP* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Mark William Flory* *Harrington Foxx Dubrow & Canter* *655 Montgomery Street, Suite 1100* *San Francisco, CA 94111*. (Flores, E)
November 12, 2019 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE to Mark Flory: Advance payment of the filing fee in the amount of $400.00 is required and should be submitted electronically using the event Payment of Fees. Your case will not be filed until the fee is paid (Local Rule 77-121c). If you wish to pay with cash, check or money order, the fee must be received by the clerk's office within 48 hours of lodging your complaint, or your documents will be deleted from the court's server. If you need assistance, please contact the CM/ECF help desk at 866-884-5444, or refer to the CM/ECF User's Manual on the court's website. (Marrujo, C)
November 8, 2019 RECEIPT number 0972-8560945 for $400.00 paid by Mark W. Flory on 11/08/2019 fbo Professional Solutions Insurance Company. (Marrujo, C)
November 8, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Plaintiff Professional Solutions Insurance Company. (Flory, Mark)
November 8, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Professional Solutions Insurance Company (Flory, Mark)
November 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Professional Solutions Insurance Company. Attorney Flory, Mark William added. (Flory, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Professional Solutions Insurance Company v. Cardot et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coleman & Horowitt LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John M Cardot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Professional Solutions Insurance Company
Represented By: Mark William Flory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?