Wilson et al v. City Of Fresno et al
Plaintiff: Charles Smith and La-Kebbia Wilson
Defendant: Kelli Furtado, Andreia Cuevas, City Of Fresno, Del Estabrooke, Kevin Watkins, Howard Lacy, Jennifer Clark, Jeffrey Cardell and Timothy Burns
Case Number: 1:2019cv01658
Filed: November 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale A Drozd
Referring Judge: Barbara A McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER: (TIME CHANGE ONLY) signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 1/16/2020; #6 #8 Motions to Dismiss on calendar 1/22/2020, WILL BE HEARD at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. The parties are encouraged to appear telephonically and may do so by dialing 877-402-9757 (access code 6966236) at the time of the hearing. Because the court may be hearing other matters using the same conference line, please wait to state your appearance until your case has been called and appearances are requested. Keep all background noise to a minimum. Use of any feature(s) that may have an impact upon the quality of voice transmission (such as speakerphones, headsets, etc.) are prohibited; use of a land line or hand-held cell phone is required. At least 24 hours prior to the hearing, if you have not already done so, you must email Courtroom Deputy Jami Thorp, at JThorp@caed.uscourts.gov, to advise the court you will be appearing telephonically. (Thorp, J)
January 15, 2020 Filing 18 REPLY by City of Fresno re #13 Opposition to Motion. (Rubin, Joseph)
January 15, 2020 Filing 17 REPLY by Howard Lacy to RESPONSE to #8 Motion to Dismiss,. (Berger, Bruce)
January 15, 2020 Filing 16 REPLY by Timothy Burns, Jeffrey Cardell, Jennifer Clark, Andreia Cuevas, Del Estabrooke, Kelli Furtado, Kevin Watkins re #13 Opposition to Motion. (Rubin, Joseph)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER (TEXT Only): The parties are hereby notified that the dial-in number and passcode for telephonic appearances before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe has been updated as follows: dial-in number 1-877-411-9748; passcode 3219139. Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/9/2020. (Valdez, E)
January 8, 2020 Filing 14 OPPOSITION by Charles Smith, La-Kebbia Wilson to #8 Motion to Dismiss,. (Simons, Rachel)
January 8, 2020 Filing 13 OPPOSITION by Charles Smith, La-Kebbia Wilson to #6 Motion to Dismiss,. (Attachments: #1 Opposition to Individual Defendants, #2 Request for Judicial Notice)(Simons, Rachel)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER (TEXT Only): Parties wishing to appear telephonically at the SCHEDULING CONFERENCE currently set for Tuesday, February 25, 2020 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe may do so with each party using the following dial-in number and passcode: dial-in number 1-877-411-9748; passcode 3190866. Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/27/2019. (Valdez, E)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER: (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 12/20/2019. Plaintiffs requested leave to file opposition briefs exceeding the 25-page limit by an additional 15 pages for each brief. (Doc. Nos. #9 , #10 .) The court finds good cause is shown only for an additional five pages. Accordingly, the court grants an extension of the page limit to 30 pages for each opposition brief. (Thorp, J)
December 19, 2019 Filing 10 APPLICATION for Extend Page Limitation for Plaintiffs' Opposition to Individual Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Charles Smith, La-Kebbia Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Simons, Rachel)
December 19, 2019 Filing 9 APPLICATION for Extend Page Limitation for Plaintiffs' Opposition to City of Fresno's Motion to Dismiss by Charles Smith, La-Kebbia Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Simons, Rachel)
November 27, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to DISMISS by Howard Lacy. Motion Hearing set for 1/22/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Attachments: #1 Points and Authorities in Suppport of Motion by Defendant Howard Lacy to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint, #2 Exhibit Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion by Defendand Howard Lacy to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint)(Berger, Bruce)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER: (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 11/27/2019. The #6 Motion to Dismiss currently noticed for 1/21/2020 is CONTINUED to 1/22/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd.(Thorp, J)
November 26, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to DISMISS by Timothy Burns, Jeffrey Cardell, City Of Fresno, Jennifer Clark, Andreia Cuevas, Del Estabrooke, Kelli Furtado, Kevin Watkins. Motion Hearing set for 1/21/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Attachments: #1 Notice, #2 Points and Authorities, #3 Points and Authorities, #4 Request for Judicial Notice)(Rubin, Joseph)
November 25, 2019 Filing 5 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 2/25/2020 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Sant Agata, S)
November 22, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Timothy Burns, Jeffrey Cardell, City Of Fresno, Jennifer Clark, Andreia Cuevas, Del Estabrooke, Kelli Furtado, Kevin Watkins (Rubin, Joseph)
November 22, 2019 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE to Attorney Joseph Rubin: Under Local Rule 3-200, every complaint, amended complaint, or other document initiating a civil action shall be accompanied by acompleted civil cover sheet, on a form available from the Clerk and on the Court's website. Please file your civil cover sheet. If youneed assistance, please contact the CM/ECF help desk at 866-884-5444, or refer to the CM/ECF User's Manual on the court's website. (Sant Agata, S)
November 21, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Rachel Elizabeth Simons on behalf of Charles Smith, La-Kebbia Wilson. Attorney Simons, Rachel Elizabeth added. (Simons, Rachel)
November 21, 2019 RECEIPT number 0972-8582490 for $400.00 for Kevin Watkins, et al. from Joseph Rubin. (Sant Agata, S)
November 21, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Fresno County Superior Court, case number 19CECG03821 by Kevin Watkins, Jeffrey Cardell, Kelli Furtado, Timothy Burns, Del Estabrooke, City Of Fresno, Andreia Cuevas, Jennifer Clark.(Rubin, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson et al v. City Of Fresno et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelli Furtado
Represented By: James B. Betts
Represented By: Joseph D. Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andreia Cuevas
Represented By: James B. Betts
Represented By: Joseph D. Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Of Fresno
Represented By: James B. Betts
Represented By: Joseph D. Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Del Estabrooke
Represented By: James B. Betts
Represented By: Joseph D. Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Watkins
Represented By: James B. Betts
Represented By: Joseph D. Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard Lacy
Represented By: Bruce James Berger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Clark
Represented By: James B. Betts
Represented By: Joseph D. Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Cardell
Represented By: James B. Betts
Represented By: Joseph D. Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Burns
Represented By: James B. Betts
Represented By: Joseph D. Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Smith
Represented By: Gary G. Goyette
Represented By: Rachel Elizabeth Simons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: La-Kebbia Wilson
Represented By: Gary G. Goyette
Represented By: Rachel Elizabeth Simons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?