(SS) Diaz v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Andy Diaz
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2019cv01661
Filed: November 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Gary S Austin
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:402
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Andy Diaz. Commissioner of Social Security served on 12/11/2019, answer due 2/10/2020. (Martin-Gill, S)
December 18, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Coder, Ellinor)
December 17, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Pena, Jonathan)
December 17, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF SUBMITTING SERVICE DOCUMENTS to the U.S. Marshal by Andy Diaz pursuant to order of the court. (Pena, Jonathan)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER and ORDER RE CONSENT in SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL; Consent or Decline due by 3/5/2020. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 Consent Form, #3 USM Social Security Instructions) (Marrujo, C)
December 3, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Commissioner of Social Security* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Jonathan Omar Pena* *Pena & Bromberg, Attorneys at Law* *2440 Tulare St., Suite 320* *Fresno, CA 93721*. (Marrujo, C)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 12/2/19. (Marrujo, C)
November 25, 2019 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Action Required. (Flores, E)
November 22, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Andy Diaz. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pena, Jonathan)
November 22, 2019 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security by Andy Diaz. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pena, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (SS) Diaz v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andy Diaz
Represented By: Jonathan Omar Pena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Ellinor Ravenel Coder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?