Association of Irritated Residents v. Owens-Illinois, Inc.
Plaintiff: Association of Irritated Residents
Defendant: Owens-Illinois, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01707
Filed: December 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale A Drozd
Referring Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:7604
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER (TEXT ENTRY ONLY), signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/15/2020: In light of the notice of commencement of a bankruptcy case by defendant (Doc. #5 ), this action is STAYED. The Initial Scheduling Conference set for 2/27/2020 is VACATED. (Hall, S)
January 8, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Suggestion of Pendency of Bankruptcy and Automatic Stay of Proceedings by Owens-Illinois, Inc.. Attorney Cobb, Shawn T. added. (Cobb, Shawn)
December 10, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Association of Irritated Residents. (Maharg, Erica)
December 6, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 2/27/2020 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 JLT Worksheet, #3 Consent Form, #4 VDRP) (Martin-Gill, S)
December 6, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Owens-Illinois, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Erica A. Maharg* *Aqua Terra Aeris (ATA) Law Group* *490 43rd St, Suite 108* *Oakland, CA 94609*. (Martin-Gill, S)
December 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Inc. Owens-Illinois by Association of Irritated Residents. Attorney Maharg, Erica A. added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8608403) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil case cover sheet)(Maharg, Erica)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Association of Irritated Residents v. Owens-Illinois, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Association of Irritated Residents
Represented By: Erica A. Maharg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Owens-Illinois, Inc.
Represented By: Shawn T. Cobb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?