(PC) Jimenez v. Superior Court of California, County of Kings, et al.
Plaintiff: Rudy Jimenez
Defendant: Superior Court of California, County of Kings, Sullivan, CDCR and Pleasant Valley State Prison
Case Number: 1:2019cv01780
Filed: December 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale A Drozd
Referring Judge: Sheila K Oberto
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Standing Order re Judicial Emergency served on Rudy Jimenez. (Rivera, O)
February 4, 2020 Filing 6 STANDING ORDER in Light of Judicial Emergency in the Eastern District of California. (Rivera, O)
January 7, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order, #5 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Rudy Jimenez. (Gonzalez, R)
January 7, 2020 Filing 5 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED. (Gonzalez, R)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DIRECTING Clerk of Court to Issue First Informational Order in Prisoner Civil Rights Case and Directing Plaintiff to Disregard Prior-Issued Standing Order and Informational Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 1/7/2020. (Orozco, A)
January 6, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Order served on Rudy Jimenez. (Lundstrom, T)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER directing Clerk's Office to re-designate action from 440 (Other Civil Rights) to 550 (Civil Rights) signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 1/2/2020. (Lundstrom, T)
December 23, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil New Case Documents for DAD served on Rudy Jimenez. (Lundstrom, T)
December 23, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 Informational Order) (Lundstrom, T)
December 23, 2019 RECEIPT number #CAE100044493 $400.00 fbo Rudy Jimenez K73457 by Rudy Himenez on 12/23/2019. (Lundstrom, T)
December 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against County of Kings, CDCR, Pleasant Valley State Prison, and Sullivan by Rudy Jimenez.(Lundstrom, T)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Jimenez v. Superior Court of California, County of Kings, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superior Court of California, County of Kings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CDCR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pleasant Valley State Prison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rudy Jimenez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?