United States of America v. Salado, et al.
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Ronald John Salado
Trustee: Antonio Salado and Steven Salado
3Rd Party Defendant: The Ronald Salado Family Trust
Case Number: 1:2019mc00052
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Erica P Grosjean
Referring Judge: Lawrence J O'Neill
2 Judge: Sheila K Oberto
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER OF RECUSAL signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/11/2019. This case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone no longer assigned to case. New Case Number: 1:19-mc-00052-LJO-EPG. (Jessen, A)
September 5, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Related Case Order)(Didier, Kurt)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RELATING AND REASSIGNING CASE to Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill and Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone for all further proceedings. signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 9/3/2019. Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto no longer assigned to case. New Case Number: 1:19-mc-00052-LJO-SAB. (Jessen, A)
September 4, 2019 Filing 10 FIRST AMENDED CLERK'S NOTICE of Instructions to Judgment Debtor Re: Writ of Continuing Garnishment (Rent Payments). (Jessen, A)
September 4, 2019 Filing 9 FIRST AMENDED WRIT of Continuing Garnishment (Rent Payments) ISSUED. (Jessen, A)
August 30, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 The United States Notice Of Related Cases And Request That All Miscellaneous Cases Be Reassigned To The Same Magistrate Judge, #2 proposed Related Case Order)(Didier, Kurt)
August 30, 2019 Filing 6 APPLICATION for WRIT of GARNISHMENT First Amended Application For Writ of Continuing Garnishment (Rent Payments) Evergreen Ct. by United States of America. (Didier, Kurt)
August 30, 2019 Filing 5 PROPOSED ORDER re Related Cases re #4 Notice of Related Case - ATY by United States of America. (Didier, Kurt)
August 30, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of RELATED CASE 1:10-CR-00343-LJO, 1:19-MC-00046-SAB, 1:19-MC-00050-SKO, 1:19-MC-00051-SKO, 1:19-MC-00053-EPG, 1:19-MC-00054-BAM, 1:19-MC-00055-BAM by United States of America. (Didier, Kurt)
July 24, 2019 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE of Instructions to Judgment Debtor Re: Writ of Continuing Garnishment (Rent Payments). (Jessen, A)
July 24, 2019 Filing 2 WRIT of Continuing Garnishment (Rent Payments) ISSUED. (Jessen, A)
July 19, 2019 NEW MISCELLANEOUS CASE FILED; GARNISHMENT. (Lundstrom, T)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION for WRIT of GARNISHMENT Writ of Continuing Garnishment (Rent Payments) The Evergreen Ct. Property by United States of America. Attorney Didier, Kurt added. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Didier, Kurt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Salado, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald John Salado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Antonio Salado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Steven Salado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: The Ronald Salado Family Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Kurt Didier, flu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?