United States of America v. Salado
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Ronald John Salado
Trustee: Antonio Salado and Steven Salado
3Rd Party Defendant: The Ronald Salado Family Trust
Case Number: 1:2019mc00055
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Erica P Grosjean
Referring Judge: Barbara A McAuliffe
2 Judge: Lawrence J O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER of Recusal, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/11/19. New Case Number: 1:19-mc-00055-LJO-EPG.(Marrujo, C)
September 5, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Related Case Order)(Didier, Kurt)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 RELATED CASE ORDER ASSIGNING CASE to Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill and Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone for all further proceedings signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 09/03/2019. New Case Number: 1:19-mc-55 LJO-SAB.
August 30, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 The United States Notice Of Related Cases And Request That All Miscellaneous Cases Be Reassigned To The Same Magistrate Judge, #2 proposed Related Case Order)(Didier, Kurt)
August 30, 2019 Filing 13 PROPOSED ORDER re Related Cases re #12 Notice of Related Case - ATY by United States of America. (Didier, Kurt)
August 30, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of RELATED CASE 1:10-CR-00343-LJO, 1:19-MC-00046-SAB, 1:19-MC-00050-SKO, 1:19-MC-00051-SKO, 1:19-MC-00052-SKO, 1:19-MC-00053-EPG, 1:19-MC-00054-BAM by United States of America. (Didier, Kurt)
August 6, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of RELATED CASE 1:10-CR-00343 by United States of America. (Didier, Kurt)
August 5, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 1.PROOF of SERVICE of Garnishee (Rent Payments) re Clifford R. Walker, Jr, #2 2.PROOF of SERVICE of Garnishee (Rent Payments) re Valerie Walker, #3 3.ACKNOWLEDGMENT of Service and Answer of Garnishee (Rent Payments) re Clifford R. Walker, Jr., #4 4.ACKNOWLEDGMENT of Service and Answer of Garnishee (Rent Payments) re Valerie Walker, #5 5.CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Valerie Walker)(Didier, Kurt)
August 5, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by United States of America. (Didier, Kurt)
August 5, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by United States of America. (Didier, Kurt)
August 5, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 1.Application for Writ of Continuing Garnishment (Rent Payments), #2 2.Writ of Continuing Garnishment (Rent Payments), #3 3.Clerks Notice Of Instructions To Judgment Debtor Re: Writ Of Continuing Garnishment (Rent Payments), #4 4.Request For Hearing (Blank), #5 5.Instructions To Defendant/Judgment Debtor On How To Claim Exemptions, #6 6.Claim For Exemption Form (Blank) Major Exemption Under Federal Law (18 U.S.C. 3613), #7 7.Instructions To Judgment Debtor Re: Objecting To The Answer Of Garnishee (Rent Payments), #8 8.Notice of Availability of a Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction and Appeals Instructions, #9 9.Consent to/Decline of Jurisdiction of United States Magistrate Judge)(Didier, Kurt)
August 5, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Valerie Walker. (Jessen, A)
August 5, 2019 Filing 5 ACKNOWLEDGMENT of Service and Answer of Garnishee (Rent Payments) re Valerie Walker. (Jessen, A)
August 5, 2019 Filing 4 ACKNOWLEDGMENT of Service and Answer of Garnishee (Rent Payments) re Clifford R. Walker, Jr. (Jessen, A)
July 25, 2019 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE of Instructions to Judgment Debtor re: Writ of Continuing Garnishment (Rent Payments). (Marrujo, C)
July 24, 2019 Filing 2 WRIT of Continuing Garnishment (Rent Payments). (Marrujo, C)
July 19, 2019 NEW MISCELLANEOUS CASE FILED: Writ of Garnishment. (Jessen, A)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION for WRIT of GARNISHMENT Writ of Continuing Garnishment (Rent Payments) The Sunnyside Drive Property by United States of America. Attorney Didier, Kurt added. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Didier, Kurt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Salado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald John Salado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Antonio Salado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Steven Salado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: The Ronald Salado Family Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Kurt Didier, flu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?