(PC) Paul E. Duran v. Longoria
Plaintiff: Paul Edward Duran
Defendant: Longoria
Case Number: 1:2020cv00289
Filed: February 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Barbara A McAuliffe
Referring Judge: Jeremy D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #10 Order on Motion for Extension served on Paul Edward Duran. (Rivera, O)
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING #9 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 4/8/2020. First Amended Complaint due within sixty (60) days. (Rivera, O)
April 3, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for EXTENSION OF TIME to File Amended Complaint by Paul Edward Duran. (Rivera, O)
March 19, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #8 Order Reassigning Magistrate Judge, served on Paul Edward Duran. (Marrujo, C)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Chief Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: The Court having considered the equitable division and efficient and economical determination of court business, hereby reassigns this case from Magistrate Judge *Barbara A. McAuliffe* to * Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson* for all further proceedings. (Marrujo, C)
March 11, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Lundstrom, T)
March 10, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Screening Order served on Paul Edward Duran. (Rivera, O)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCREENING ORDER Granting Plaintiff Leave to File an Amended Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/9/2020. Amended Complaint or Notice of Voluntary Dismissal due within 30 days. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint Form)(Rivera, O)
March 3, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Paul Edward Duran. (Martin-Gill, S)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application) (Martin-Gill, S)
February 28, 2020 Filing 4 DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: New Case Documents served on CSP-Corcoran. (Martin-Gill, S)
February 28, 2020 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *2/25/2020*; Consent or Decline due by 4/2/2020 (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 E-Filing Notice) (Martin-Gill, S)
February 25, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Paul Edward Duran. (Martin-Gill, S)
February 25, 2020 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Longoria by Paul Edward Duran. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Martin-Gill, S)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Paul E. Duran v. Longoria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Longoria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Edward Duran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?