Taylor v. Liberty Insurance Corporation
Plaintiff: Kelly Taylor
Defendant: Liberty Insurance Corporation
Case Number: 1:2020cv00299
Filed: February 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Boone
Referring Judge: Anthony W Ishii
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Kelly Taylor. (Melaas, Heather)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/3/2020. Added attorney Heather Hall Melaas, PHV for Kelly Taylor. (Sant Agata, S)
March 2, 2020 Filing 5 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Kelly Taylor for attorney Heather Hall Melaas to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-8769010) (Rebennack, Andrew) (Attachment(s) added on 3/2/2020: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)
February 27, 2020 Filing 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 5/1/2020 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Flores, E)
February 25, 2020 Filing 3 DEMAND for TRIAL by JURY by Liberty Insurance Corporation. Attorney Lau, Norman added. (Lau, Norman)
February 24, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Liberty Insurance Corporation. (Boos, Nicholas)
February 24, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Fresno County Superior court, case number 20CECG00201 by Kelly Taylor. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8756312) (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nicholas J. Boos in Support of Defendant Liberty Insurance Corporation's Notice of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Boos, Nicholas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. Liberty Insurance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Taylor
Represented By: Andrew J. Rebennack
Represented By: Heather Hall Melaas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Norman Lau
Represented By: Nicholas J. Boos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?