(HC) Garcia v. Diaz
Petitioner: Albert Garcia
Respondent: Ralph Diaz
Case Number: 1:2020cv00304
Filed: February 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Max Feinstat on behalf of Ralph Diaz. Attorney Feinstat, Max added. (Feinstat, Max)
April 9, 2020 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Martinez, Lewis)
April 8, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #8 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case served on Albert Garcia. (Marrujo, C)
April 8, 2020 Filing 8 STANDING ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE. This case has been assigned to UnassignedDJ and Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. The new case number is: 1:20-cv-00304-NONE-JLT.. (Marrujo, C)
April 6, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Lundstrom, T)
March 10, 2020 Filing 6 DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus served on Attorney General's Office. (Rivera, O)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER RE CONSENT OR REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/10/2020. Consent or Decline due within 30 days. (Rivera, O)
March 10, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order Directing Respondent to File a Response to the Petition served on Albert Garcia. (Rivera, O)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REQUIRING RESPONDENT to File a Response; ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule; ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to Serve Documents on Attorney General signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/10/2020. Clerk to serve a copy of this order, a copy of the Petition and the Order re Consent on the Attorney General. (Rivera, O)
March 3, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Order Authorizing IFP Status, #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Albert Garcia. (Marrujo, C)
March 3, 2020 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 4/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Marrujo, C)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER AUTHORIZING IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS as to Albert Garcia, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/3/2020. (Marrujo, C)
February 28, 2020 Filing 1 (2254) PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against Ralph Diaz by Albert Garcia.(Marrujo, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC) Garcia v. Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Albert Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ralph Diaz
Represented By: Lewis Albert Martinez
Represented By: Max Feinstat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?