(SS) Dale v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Kristen Alicia Dale
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2020cv00344
Filed: March 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER (TEXT ENTRY ONLY), signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/15/2020: Pursuant to General Order 615, issued on 4/14/2020, this case is STAYED. (Hall, S)
April 2, 2020 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (McAdam, S.)
March 23, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Holmberg, Matthew)
March 23, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Kristen Alicia Dale. Commissioner of Social Security served on 3/18/2020, answer due 5/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Holmberg, Matthew)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER and ORDER RE CONSENT in SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL; Consent or Decline due by 6/11/2020. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 Consent Form, #3 USM Social Security Instructions) (Marrujo, C)
March 10, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Commissioner of Social Security* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Matthew Franklin Holmberg* *Law Offices of Lawrence D. Rohlfing* *12631 E. Imperial Highway, Suite C-115* *Santa Fe Springs, CA 90670*. (Marrujo, C)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's #2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis; ORDER DIRECTING Clerk to Issue Summons, Social Security Case Documents, and Scheduling Order; ORDER DIRECTING Service of the Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/9/2020. (Marrujo, C)
March 5, 2020 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Action Required. (Sant Agata, S)
March 4, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Kristen Alicia Dale. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Holmberg, Matthew)
March 4, 2020 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT For Review of The Final Decision Of The Social Security against Andrew Saul by Kristen Alicia Dale. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of interested parties, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Holmberg, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (SS) Dale v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: S. Wyeth McAdam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristen Alicia Dale
Represented By: Matthew Franklin Holmberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?