California Natural Resources Agency, et al. v. Ross, et al.
Plaintiff: State of California by and through California Attorney General Xavier Becerra, California Environmental Protection Agency and California Natural Resources Agency
Defendant: David Bernhardt, U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service, U.S. Bureau of Reclamation, Aurelia Skipwith, Wilbur Ross, Brenda Burman, National Marine Fisheries Service, Chris Oliver, Friant Water Authority and Arvin Edison Water Storage District
Intervenor: San Luis & Delta-Mendota Water Authority, State Water Contractors, Westlands Water District and Tehama-Colusa Canal Authority
Intervenor Defendant: Sacramento River Intervenors, Oji Brothers Farm, Inc., Sutter Mutual Water Company, Maxwell Irrigation District, River Garden Farms, Inc., Pleasant Grove-Verona Mutual Water Company, Glenn-Colusa Irrigation District, Howald Farms, Inc., Windswept Land and Livestock Company, Reclamation District 108, Henry D. Richter, et al., Pelger Road 1700 LLC, Contra Costa Water District, Conaway Preservation Group LLC, City of Redding, Oji Partnership, Inc., Provident Irrigation District, Princeton-Codora-Glenn Irrigation District, David and Alice te Velde Family Trust, Tisdale Irrigation and Drainage Company, Reclamation District 104, Reclamation District No. 1004, Natomas Central Mutual Water Company, Oakdale Irrigation District, Pelger Mutual Water Company, Anderson-Cottonwood Irrigation District, Meridian Farms Water Company, Carter Mutual Water Company, South San Joaquin Irrigation District, Beverly F. Andreotti, et al. and Knights Landing Investors, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00426
Filed: March 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale A Drozd
Referring Judge: Erica P Grosjean
2 Judge: Sheila K Oberto
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2020 Filing 114 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: California Environmental Protection Agency served on 2/27/2020, answer due 3/19/2020; California Natural Resources Agency served on 2/27/2020, answer due 3/19/2020; State of California by and through California Attorney General Xavier Becerra served on 2/27/2020, answer due 3/19/2020. (Van Loh, Sara)
May 21, 2020 Filing 113 NOTICE of RELATED CASE(S) 1:20-CV-00426-DAD, 1:20-CV-00431-DAD by California Environmental Protection Agency. (Buse, John)
May 19, 2020 Filing 112 NOTICE by All Defendants. (McDonald, Eve)
May 15, 2020 RECEIPT number #CAE200106402 $1000.00 Bond fbo State of California by State of CA Dept of Justice on 5/15/2020. Re #106 Order on Motion #54 for Preliminary Injunction. (Reader, L)
May 15, 2020 Filing 111 CLERK'S NOTICE: Please disregard CAED Receipt CAE100045656, DATED 05/14/2020-Entered in wrong case number. (Martin-Gill, S)
May 14, 2020 [DISREGARD- ENTERED IN WRONG CASE] RECEIPT number #CAE100045656 $1,000.00 fbo Altshuler Berzon LLP by Altshuler Berzon LLP on 5/14/2020 (BOND). (Martin-Gill, S) Modified on 5/15/2020 (Donati, J).
May 14, 2020 Filing 110 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Jeffrey Reusch on behalf of California Environmental Protection Agency, California Natural Resources Agency, State of California by and through California Attorney General Xavier Becerra. Attorney Reusch, Jeffrey added. (Reusch, Jeffrey)
May 13, 2020 Filing 109 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 5-7-20, Preliminary Injunction Hearing before District Judge Dale A. Drozd, filed by Court Reporter Karen Hooven, Phone number 559-264-0584 E-mail karenhooven@yahoo.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction must be filed within 5 court days. Redaction Request due 6/4/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/15/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/13/2020. (Hooven, K)
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 108 MINUTE ORDER: (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 5/12/2020. The recently issued memorandum opinion and order #106 was inadvertently docketed twice. Accordingly, the second, identical version #107 is stricken from the record. (Thorp, J)
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ***STRICKEN see Doc. #106 *** ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR PRELMINARY INJUNCTION (Doc. No. #54 ) signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 5/11/2020. (Thorp, J) Modified on 5/12/2020 -Duplicate order. (Thorp, J).
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER GRANTING #54 Motion for Preliminary Injunction signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 5/11/2020. (Coffman, Lisa)
May 11, 2020 Filing 105 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by David Bernhardt, Brenda Burman, National Marine Fisheries Service, Chris Oliver, Wilbur Ross, Aurelia Skipwith, U.S. Bureau of Reclamation, U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service for proceedings held on May 7, 2020 before Judge Drozd. Court Reporter Karen Hooven. (Smith, Nicole)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 104 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING INTERVENTION OF CONTRA COSTA WATER DISTRICT signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 5/10/2020. (Thorp, J)
May 8, 2020 Filing 103 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Friant Water Authority for proceedings held on 4/7/20 before Judge Dale A. Drozd. Court Reporter Karen Hooven. (Adams, Matthew)
May 8, 2020 Filing 102 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Arvin Edison Water Storage District for proceedings held on 5/7/20 before Judge Dale A. Drozd. Court Reporter Karen Hooven. (Adams, Matthew)
May 8, 2020 Filing 101 NOTICE Request for Judicial Notice by All Defendants. (McDonald, Eve)
May 8, 2020 Filing 100 NOTICE of New Information by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit)(McDonald, Eve)
May 7, 2020 Filing 99 MINUTES (Text Only) for joint proceedings held via video conference before District Judge Dale A. Drozd: Motion Hearing held on 5/7/2020 in cases 1:20-cv-00426-DAD-EPG and case 1:20-cv-00431-DAD-EPG. #54 Motion for Preliminary Injunction argued. Plaintiffs' witness Doctor Bruce Herbold sworn and testified. Defendants' witness Kristin White sworn and testified. Plaintiffs' witness Jonathan Rosenfield sworn and testified. Any supplemental filings are to be filed no later than noon 5/8/2020. Motion is submitted and taken under submission. Written order will issue. Plaintiffs' Counsel Sarah Van Loh, Jeffrey Reusch, Barbara Chisholm, Glen Spain and Elizabeth Vissers (Zoom) present. Defendants' Counsel Nicole Smith, Lori Carmanian and Lesley Lawrence-Hammer telephonically (Zoom) present. Defendants' Intervenors Counsel Dan O'Hanlon, Jenna Mandell-Rice, Rachel Jacobson, Meredith Nikkel, Andrew Hitchings and Matthew Adams (Zoom) present. Court Reporter/CD Number: Karen Hooven (Zoom) present. (Thorp, J)
May 7, 2020 Filing 98 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by California Environmental Protection Agency, California Natural Resources Agency, State of California by and through California Attorney General Xavier Becerra in re #54 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #82 Reply. (Fuchs, Daniel)
May 6, 2020 Filing 97 NOTICE of Appearance of Lori Caramanian by David Bernhardt, Brenda Burman, National Marine Fisheries Service, Wilbur Ross, Aurelia Skipwith, U.S. Bureau of Reclamation, U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service. (McDonald, Eve)
May 6, 2020 Filing 96 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by California Environmental Protection Agency, California Natural Resources Agency, State of California by and through California Attorney General Xavier Becerra for proceedings held on 05/07/2020 before Judge Hon. Dale A. Drozd. Court Reporter Karen Hooven. (Fuchs, Daniel)
May 6, 2020 Filing 95 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by State Water Contractors for proceedings held on May 7, 2020 before Judge Hon. Dale A. Drozd. Court Reporter Karen Hooven. (Mandell-Rice, Jenna)
May 6, 2020 Filing 94 [DISREGARD - TO BE REFILED] NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Daniel M. Fuchs on behalf of California Environmental Protection Agency, California Natural Resources Agency, State of California by and through California Attorney General Xavier Becerra. (Fuchs, Daniel) Modified on 5/6/2020 (Benson, A.).
May 6, 2020 Filing 93 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Anderson-Cottonwood Irrigation District, Beverly F. Andreotti, et al., Carter Mutual Water Company, City of Redding, Conaway Preservation Group LLC, David and Alice te Velde Family Trust, Glenn-Colusa Irrigation District, Henry D. Richter, et al., Howald Farms, Inc., Knights Landing Investors, LLC, Maxwell Irrigation District, Meridian Farms Water Company, Natomas Central Mutual Water Company, Oji Brothers Farm, Inc., Oji Partnership, Inc., Pelger Mutual Water Company, Pelger Road 1700 LLC, Pleasant Grove-Verona Mutual Water Company, Princeton-Codora-Glenn Irrigation District, Provident Irrigation District, Reclamation District 104, Reclamation District 108, Reclamation District No. 1004, River Garden Farms, Inc., Sutter Mutual Water Company, Tehama-Colusa Canal Authority, Tisdale Irrigation and Drainage Company, Windswept Land and Livestock Company for proceedings held on 5/7/2020 before Judge Dale A. Drozd. Court Reporter Karen Hooven. (Hamilton, Brian)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 92 MINUTE ORDER: (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 5/6/2020. The court has received and reviewed California's motion to strike #83 . The filings California seeks to strike were submitted on April 30, 2020. All parties knew, or should have known, that the court would begin reviewing and digesting them immediately in order to prepare for the May 7, 2020 expedited hearing, set on shorted time at California's request. These documents were not terribly lengthy and could have been reviewed by California immediately as well. Yet, California waited until Sunday, May 3, 2020 to move to strike them. For that reason, the motion is arguably untimely. Moreover, although the "uniqueness" of some portions of defendant-intervenor's filings is debatable, they were not entirely duplicative. Under the circumstances (including the absence of significant time for any defendant intervenor to review any other opposing party's briefs before filing), the court does not believe any party has violated the letter of the court's prior order. Accordingly, the motion to strike is DENIED. That said, the court intends to issue further, detailed orders designed to reign in motions practice in these cases in the future. (Thorp, J)
May 5, 2020 Filing 91 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Intervention of Contra Costa Water District by Contra Costa Water District. Attorney Bruner, Marc R. added. (Bruner, Marc)
May 5, 2020 Filing 90 NOTICE of ERRATA by U.S. Bureau of Reclamation re #78 Opposition to Motion.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Corrected Declaration on Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Corrected file of Exh A through M)(McDonald, Eve)
May 5, 2020 Filing 89 NOTICE of ERRATA by California Environmental Protection Agency, California Natural Resources Agency, State of California by and through California Attorney General Xavier Becerra re #82 Reply.. (Fuchs, Daniel)
May 5, 2020 Filing 88 OPPOSITION by State Water Contractors to #83 Motion to Strike,. (Mandell-Rice, Jenna)
May 5, 2020 Filing 87 OPPOSITION by Arvin Edison Water Storage District, Friant Water Authority to #83 Motion to Strike,. (Adams, Matthew)
May 5, 2020 Filing 86 OPPOSITION by San Luis & Delta-Mendota Water Authority, Westlands Water District to #83 Motion to Strike,. (O'Hanlon, Daniel)
May 5, 2020 Filing 85 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by San Luis & Delta-Mendota Water Authority, Westlands Water District for proceedings held on 5/7/20 before Judge Drozd. Court Reporter Karen Hooven. (O'Hanlon, Daniel)
May 3, 2020 Filing 84 PROPOSED ORDER re Motion to Strike re #83 MOTION to STRIKE re #77 Opposition to Motion, #74 Opposition to Motion, #75 Opposition,. by California Environmental Protection Agency, California Natural Resources Agency, State of California by and through California Attorney General Xavier Becerra. (Fuchs, Daniel)
May 3, 2020 Filing 83 MOTION to STRIKE re #77 Opposition to Motion, #74 Opposition to Motion, #75 Opposition,. by California Environmental Protection Agency, California Natural Resources Agency, State of California by and through California Attorney General Xavier Becerra. Motion Hearing set for 5/7/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Fuchs, Daniel)
May 3, 2020 Filing 82 REPLY by California Environmental Protection Agency, California Natural Resources Agency, State of California by and through California Attorney General Xavier Becerra re #54 Motion for Preliminary Injunction,. (Fuchs, Daniel)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 81 MINUTE ORDER: (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 5/1/2020. Federal Defendants' motion for leave to file their brief 15 minutes late #79 is GRANTED. (Thorp, J)
April 30, 2020 Filing 80 OPPOSITION by U.S. Bureau of Reclamation to #54 Motion for Preliminary Injunction,. (McDonald, Eve)
April 30, 2020 Filing 79 MOTION Leave to File Out of Time by U.S. Bureau of Reclamation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(McDonald, Eve)
April 30, 2020 Filing 78 OPPOSITION by U.S. Bureau of Reclamation to #54 Motion for Preliminary Injunction,. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit)(McDonald, Eve)
April 30, 2020 Filing 77 OPPOSITION by Arvin Edison Water Storage District, Friant Water Authority to #54 Motion for Preliminary Injunction,. (Adams, Matthew)
April 30, 2020 Filing 76 OPPOSITION by Anderson-Cottonwood Irrigation District, Beverly F. Andreotti, et al., Carter Mutual Water Company, City of Redding, Conaway Preservation Group LLC, David and Alice te Velde Family Trust, Glenn-Colusa Irrigation District, Henry D. Richter, et al., Howald Farms, Inc., Knights Landing Investors, LLC, Maxwell Irrigation District, Meridian Farms Water Company, Natomas Central Mutual Water Company, Oji Brothers Farm, Inc., Oji Partnership, Inc., Pelger Mutual Water Company, Pelger Road 1700 LLC, Pleasant Grove-Verona Mutual Water Company, Princeton-Codora-Glenn Irrigation District, Provident Irrigation District, Reclamation District 104, Reclamation District 108, Reclamation District No. 1004, River Garden Farms, Inc., Sutter Mutual Water Company, Tehama-Colusa Canal Authority, Tisdale Irrigation and Drainage Company, Windswept Land and Livestock Company to #54 Motion for Preliminary Injunction,. Attorney Nikkel, Meredith E. added. (Nikkel, Meredith)
April 30, 2020 Filing 75 OPPOSITION by Intervenor State Water Contractors to #54 MOTION for PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION PLAINTIFFS' MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTIVE. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jenna Mandell-Rice, #2 Declaration of Shawn Acuna, Ph.D.)(Mandell-Rice, Jenna)
April 30, 2020 Filing 74 OPPOSITION by San Luis & Delta-Mendota Water Authority, Westlands Water District to #54 Motion for Preliminary Injunction,. (Attachments: #1 Declaration C. Hanson, Ph.D., #2 Declaration P. Arroyave, #3 Declaration W. R. Freeman, #4 Declaration T. Boardman, #5 Exhibit A to T. Boardman Decl., #6 Exhibit B to T. Boardman Decl., #7 Exhibit C to T. Boardman Decl.)(O'Hanlon, Daniel)
April 30, 2020 Filing 73 DECLARATION of Matt Nobriga in opposition to #54 Motion for Preliminary Injunction,. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Second Israel Decl., #2 Exhibit Israel Attachment 1, #3 Exhibit Israel Attachment 2, #4 Exhibit Israel Attachment 3, #5 Exhibit Israel Attachment 4, #6 Exhibit Israel Attachment 5)(Smith, Nicole)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 72 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING INTERVENTION BY FRIANT WATER AUTHORITY AND ARVIN-EDISON WATER STORAGE DISTRICT signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 4/27/2020. (Thorp, J)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 71 STIPULATION AND ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND PAGE LIMITS FOR PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 4/27/2020. Motion Hearing set for 5/7/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. Lawyers who plan to speak and any key witnesses must appear via Zoom. Parties will receive Zoom ID number and password for the hearing by email. All other interested parties who will not be speaking are to phone in telephonically by dialing 877-402-9757, access code 6966236 at the time of hearing. (Thorp, J)
April 27, 2020 Filing 70 STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED COMPLAINT by David Bernhardt, Brenda Burman, National Marine Fisheries Service, Chris Oliver, Wilbur Ross, Aurelia Skipwith, U.S. Bureau of Reclamation, U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service. (Lawrence-Hammer, Lesley)
April 27, 2020 Filing 69 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for briefing schedule and hearing date for prelim. inj. re #54 MOTION for PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION PLAINTIFFS' MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTIVE, #53 Notice - Other, by California Environmental Protection Agency, California Natural Resources Agency, State of California by and through California Attorney General Xavier Becerra. (Fuchs, Daniel)
April 27, 2020 Filing 68 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Intervention by Friant Water Authority and Arvin-Edison Water Storage District by Friant Water Authority. (Adams, Matthew)
April 23, 2020 Filing 67 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Kenneth Michael Robbins on behalf of South San Joaquin Irrigation District. Attorney Robbins, Kenneth Michael added. (Robbins, Kenneth)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER re Stipulation Regarding Intervention by Oakdale Irrigation District and South San Joaquin Irrigation District, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 4/22/2020. (Marrujo, C)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER GRANTING Motions #13 #24 for Permissive Intervention With Conditions on Briefing, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 4/22/2020. (Marrujo, C)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER RELATING Cases and REASSIGNING Magistrate Judge, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 4/22/2020. New Case Number: 1:20CV00426DADEPG. (Marrujo, C)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 63 MINUTE ORDER: (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 4/22/2020. The court has received and reviewed plaintiffs' ex parte request to shorten time #52 on the recently-filed motion for preliminary injunction (PI) #54 . Given the preliminary showing therein indicating that irreparable harm may ensue as early as May 11, 2020, the court intends to set a joint hearing on the PI motion and on the parallel PI motion in the companion case Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations v. Ross, 1:20-cv-00431 DAD EPG, for either May 5, 6, or 7, 2020. Given the numbers of parties involved, the court would prefer that all parties in both cases meet and confer immediately in an effort to reach a stipulation to one or two proposed time(s) and date(s) for the hearing that best suit their schedules. The court also requests that the parties attempt to reach agreement as to a briefing schedule that would give the court at least 7 calendar days prior to the hearing date to review any opposition(s) and at least four calendar days to review any replies. The parties are cautioned that, in light of this accelerated timeline, limiting participation by the intervenors to briefing of issues that are truly unique to those intervenors will be necessary. For example, the court does not anticipate having sufficient time to review declarations from intervenor experts who plan to address issues already covered by the federal defendants, even if those expert opinions diverge from federal defendants' expert opinions. Such nuanced differences must, as a matter of practical reality, wait until briefing on the merits takes place. Thus, any submission by intervenors must be strictly limited to issues and opinions truly unique to the intervenor. Any stipulation should take this into account or the court will consider imposing such constraints sua sponte. (Thorp, J)
April 22, 2020 Filing 62 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Intervention by Oakdale Irrigation District, South San Joaquin Irrigation District. Attorney Wasiewski, Timothy J. added. (Wasiewski, Timothy)
April 22, 2020 Filing 61 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Andrew Morrow Hitchings on behalf of Anderson-Cottonwood Irrigation District, City of Redding, Conaway Preservation Group LLC, David and Alice te Velde Family Trust, Glenn-Colusa Irrigation District, Knights Landing Investors, LLC, Pelger Road 1700 LLC, Reclamation District No. 1004. Attorney Hitchings, Andrew Morrow added. (Hitchings, Andrew)
April 21, 2020 Filing 60 PROPOSED ORDER re Motion for Preliminary Injunction re #53 Notice - Other,. (Van Loh, Sara)
April 21, 2020 Filing 59 EXHIBIT re #54 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, filed by State of California by and through California Attorney General Xavier Becerra, California Natural Resources Agency, California Environmental Protection Agency. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 22, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 23, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 24, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 25, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 26, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 27, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 28, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 29, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 30, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 31, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 32, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 33, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 34, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 35, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 36, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 37)(Van Loh, Sara)
April 21, 2020 Filing 58 EXHIBIT REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re #54 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, filed by State of California by and through California Attorney General Xavier Becerra, California Natural Resources Agency, California Environmental Protection Agency. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 14, #2 Exhibit 15, #3 Exhibit 16, #4 Exhibit 17, #5 Exhibit 18, #6 Exhibit 19, #7 Exhibit 20, #8 Exhibit 21)(Van Loh, Sara)
April 21, 2020 Filing 57 EXHIBIT re #54 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, filed by State of California by and through California Attorney General Xavier Becerra, California Natural Resources Agency, California Environmental Protection Agency. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 6, #2 Exhibit 7, #3 Exhibit 8, #4 Exhibit 9, #5 Exhibit 10, #6 Exhibit 11, #7 Exhibit 12, #8 Exhibit 13)(Van Loh, Sara)
April 21, 2020 Filing 56 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by California Environmental Protection Agency, California Natural Resources Agency, State of California by and through California Attorney General Xavier Becerra in re #54 Motion for Preliminary Injunction,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Van Loh, Sara)
April 21, 2020 Filing 55 DECLARATION of Bruce Herbold, Ph.D in support of #54 Motion for Preliminary Injunction,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Van Loh, Sara)
April 21, 2020 Filing 54 MOTION for PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION PLAINTIFFS' MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTIVE by California Environmental Protection Agency, California Natural Resources Agency, State of California by and through California Attorney General Xavier Becerra. Motion Hearing set for 5/19/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Van Loh, Sara)
April 21, 2020 Filing 53 NOTICE PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by California Environmental Protection Agency, California Natural Resources Agency, State of California by and through California Attorney General Xavier Becerra. (Van Loh, Sara)
April 21, 2020 Filing 52 EX PARTE APPLICATION by California Environmental Protection Agency, California Natural Resources Agency, State of California by and through California Attorney General Xavier Becerra for Order Shortening Time on Preliminary Injunction Hearing;Supporting Memorandum of Points and Authorities. (Attachments: #1 Declaration OF DANIEL M. FUCHS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR HEARING ON MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, #2 Proposed Order GRANTING PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR HEARING ON MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION)(Fuchs, Daniel)
April 21, 2020 Filing 51 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against David Bernhardt, Brenda Burman, National Marine Fisheries Service, Chris Oliver, Wilbur Ross, Aurelia Skipwith, U.S. Bureau of Reclamation, U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service by California Environmental Protection Agency, California Natural Resources Agency, State of California by and through California Attorney General Xavier Becerra.(Fuchs, Daniel)
April 21, 2020 Filing 50 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Kevin M. O'Brien on behalf of Anderson-Cottonwood Irrigation District, Beverly F. Andreotti, et al., Carter Mutual Water Company, City of Redding, Conaway Preservation Group LLC, David and Alice te Velde Family Trust, Glenn-Colusa Irrigation District, Henry D. Richter, et al., Howald Farms, Inc., Knights Landing Investors, LLC, Maxwell Irrigation District, Meridian Farms Water Company, Natomas Central Mutual Water Company, Oji Brothers Farm, Inc., Oji Partnership, Inc., Pelger Mutual Water Company, Pelger Road 1700 LLC, Pleasant Grove-Verona Mutual Water Company, Princeton-Codora-Glenn Irrigation District, Provident Irrigation District, Reclamation District 104, Reclamation District 108, River Garden Farms, Inc., Sutter Mutual Water Company, Tehama-Colusa Canal Authority, Tisdale Irrigation and Drainage Company, Windswept Land and Livestock Company. Attorney O'Brien, Kevin M. added. (O'Brien, Kevin)
April 21, 2020 Filing 49 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Andrea Clark on behalf of Tehama-Colusa Canal Authority. Attorney Clark, Andrea added. (Clark, Andrea)
April 21, 2020 Filing 48 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Samuel E. Bivins on behalf of Anderson-Cottonwood Irrigation District, Beverly F. Andreotti, et al., Carter Mutual Water Company, City of Redding, Conaway Preservation Group LLC, David and Alice te Velde Family Trust, Glenn-Colusa Irrigation District, Henry D. Richter, et al., Howald Farms, Inc., Knights Landing Investors, LLC, Maxwell Irrigation District, Meridian Farms Water Company, Natomas Central Mutual Water Company, Oji Brothers Farm, Inc., Oji Partnership, Inc., Pelger Mutual Water Company, Pelger Road 1700 LLC, Pleasant Grove-Verona Mutual Water Company, Princeton-Codora-Glenn Irrigation District, Provident Irrigation District, Reclamation District 104, Reclamation District 108, River Garden Farms, Inc., Sutter Mutual Water Company, Tehama-Colusa Canal Authority, Tisdale Irrigation and Drainage Company, Windswept Land and Livestock Company. Attorney Bivins, Samuel E. added. (Bivins, Samuel)
April 21, 2020 Filing 47 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Brian Edward Hamilton on behalf of Anderson-Cottonwood Irrigation District, Beverly F. Andreotti, et al., Carter Mutual Water Company, City of Redding, Conaway Preservation Group LLC, David and Alice te Velde Family Trust, Glenn-Colusa Irrigation District, Henry D. Richter, et al., Howald Farms, Inc., Knights Landing Investors, LLC, Maxwell Irrigation District, Meridian Farms Water Company, Natomas Central Mutual Water Company, Oji Brothers Farm, Inc., Oji Partnership, Inc., Pelger Mutual Water Company, Pelger Road 1700 LLC, Pleasant Grove-Verona Mutual Water Company, Princeton-Codora-Glenn Irrigation District, Provident Irrigation District, Reclamation District 104, Reclamation District 108, River Garden Farms, Inc., Sutter Mutual Water Company, Tehama-Colusa Canal Authority, Tisdale Irrigation and Drainage Company, Windswept Land and Livestock Company. Attorney Hamilton, Brian Edward added. (Hamilton, Brian)
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 STIPULATION and ORDER regarding Intervention signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 4/17/2020. Sacramento River Intervenors added. (Lundstrom, T)
April 16, 2020 Filing 45 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Intervention by Tehama-Colusa Canal Authority, Reclamation District 108, Sutter Mutual Water Company, Natomas Central Mutual Water Company, River Garden Farms, Inc., Pleasant Grove-Verona Mutual Water Company, Pelger Mutual Water Company, Meridian Farms Water Company, Henry D. Richter, et al., Howald Farms, Inc., Oji Brothers Farm, Inc., Oji Partnership, Inc., Carter Mutual Water Company, Windswept Land and Livestock Company, Maxwell Irrigation District, Beverly F. Andreotti, et al., Tisdale Irrigation and Drainage Company, Provident Irrigation District, Princeton-Codora-Glenn Irrigation District, Glenn-Colusa Irrigation District, Reclamation District 104, Conaway Preservation Group LLC, David and Alice te Velde Family Trust, Pelger Road 1700 LLC, Anderson-Cottonwood Irrigation District, City of Redding, Knights Landing Investors, LLC. Attorney Nikkel, Meredith E. added. (Nikkel, Meredith)
April 9, 2020 Filing 44 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Eve W. McDonald, GOVT on behalf of David Bernhardt, Brenda Burman, National Marine Fisheries Service, Wilbur Ross, Aurelia Skipwith, U.S. Bureau of Reclamation, U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service. Attorney McDonald, Eve W. added. (McDonald, Eve)
April 9, 2020 Filing 43 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Lesley Lawrence-Hammer on behalf of David Bernhardt, Brenda Burman, National Marine Fisheries Service, Chris Oliver, Wilbur Ross, Aurelia Skipwith, U.S. Bureau of Reclamation, U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service. Attorney Lawrence-Hammer, Lesley added. (Lawrence-Hammer, Lesley)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 4/8/2020. Added attorney Sara Vink Mogharabi, PHV for Arvin Edison Water Storage District and Friant Water Authority. (Sant Agata, S)
April 8, 2020 RECEIPT number 0972-8833733 for $225.00 for Sara V. Mogharabi from Matthew G. Adams. (Gonzalez, R)
April 8, 2020 Filing 41 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Friant Water Authority for attorney Sara V. Mogharabi to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Adams, Matthew)
April 7, 2020 Filing 40 MOTION to INTERVENE by Friant Water Authority, Arvin Edison Water Storage District. Attorney Adams, Matthew G. added. Motion Hearing set for 5/19/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of M. Adams, #3 Declaration of Ottomoeller, #4 Declaration of Arvin-Edison, #5 Proposed Answer)(Adams, Matthew)
April 1, 2020 Filing 39 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Nicole Marie Smith on behalf of David Bernhardt, Brenda Burman, National Marine Fisheries Service, Chris Oliver, Wilbur Ross, Aurelia Skipwith, U.S. Bureau of Reclamation, U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service. Attorney Smith, Nicole Marie added. (Smith, Nicole)
March 30, 2020 Filing 38 STATEMENT of NON-OPPOSITION by California Environmental Protection Agency, California Natural Resources Agency, State of California by and through California Attorney General Xavier Becerra to #24 Motion to Intervene,. (Van Loh, Sara)
March 30, 2020 Filing 37 STATEMENT of NON-OPPOSITION by California Environmental Protection Agency, California Natural Resources Agency, State of California by and through California Attorney General Xavier Becerra to #13 Motion to Intervene,. (Van Loh, Sara)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 PRO HAC VICE ORDER added Rachel Jacobson for Westlands Waters District, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 3/27/2020. (Kusamura, W)
March 27, 2020 Filing 35 STATEMENT of NON-OPPOSITION by San Luis & Delta-Mendota Water Authority, Westlands Water District to #13 Motion to Intervene,. (O'Hanlon, Daniel)
March 27, 2020 Filing 34 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Westlands Water District for attorney Rachel Jacobson to appear Pro Hac Vice.(Filing fee $ 225) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Jacobson, Rachel)
March 24, 2020 Filing 33 CLERK's NOTICE to Attorney, Jenna Mandell-Rice. Please disregard #32 Notice to submit Application to Practice Pro Hac Vice. (Lundstrom, T)
March 24, 2020 Filing 32 CLERK's NOTICE to Attorney, Jenna Mandell-Rice to submit an Application to Practice Pro Hac Vice in the Eastern District of California. (Lundstrom, T)
March 24, 2020 Filing 31 CLERK's NOTICE to Attorneys Colleen R. Flannery, NACED and Rachel Jacobson, NACED to submit Petition to Practice in the Eastern District of California. (Lundstrom, T)
March 24, 2020 Filing 30 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 6/23/2020 at 09:45 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order re Judicial Emergency, #3 Consent Form, #4 VDRP) (Lundstrom, T)
March 24, 2020 Filing 29 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Northern; Case Number 3:20-cv-01299.
March 20, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE TO PARTIES. So that the parties do not have to do this, the court will fed ex to the Eastern District this afternoon the chambers copies of all pending motions and the pleadings (in both cases). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Beeler, Laurel) (Filed on 3/20/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/24/2020.]
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA. (Beeler, Laurel) (Filed on 3/20/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/24/2020.]
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER.In the attached order, the court grants the motions to transfer and transfers the case (and the related case of California Natural Resources Agency v. Ross, No. 20-cv-01299-LB) to the Eastern District of California. (Beeler, Laurel) (Filed on 3/20/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/24/2020.]
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #23 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Jenna Mandell-Rice representing Intervenor Defendant State Water Contractors. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/24/2020.]
March 19, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION to Intervene filed by State Water Contractors. Motion Hearing set for 4/23/2020 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Responses due by 4/2/2020. Replies due by 4/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jennifer Pierre, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proposed Answer)(McAdam, Allison) (Filed on 3/19/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/24/2020.]
March 19, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14298213.) filed by State Water Contractors. (Mandell-Rice, Jenna) (Filed on 3/19/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/24/2020.]
March 17, 2020 Filing 22 Statement PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE REGARDING PENDING MOTIONS TO TRANSFER IN RELATED CASE PCFFA v. ROSS, No. 3:19-cv-7897 by California Environmental Protection Agency, California Natural Resources Agency, State of California by and through California Attorney General Xavier Becerra. (Van Loh, Sara) (Filed on 3/17/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/24/2020.]
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #18 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Rachel Jacobson representing Intervenor Westlands Water District. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/24/2020.]
March 10, 2020 Filing 20 AMENDED DOCUMENT by San Luis & Delta-Mendota Water Authority, Westlands Water District. Amendment to #13 MOTION to Intervene Amended [Proposed] Order. (O'Hanlon, Daniel) (Filed on 3/10/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/24/2020.]
March 10, 2020 Filing 19 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by California Natural Resources Agency.. (Fuchs, Daniel) (Filed on 3/10/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/24/2020.]
March 10, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14264488.) filed by San Luis & Delta-Mendota Water Authority, Westlands Water District. (O'Hanlon, Daniel) (Filed on 3/10/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/24/2020.]
March 10, 2020 Filing 17 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by San Luis & Delta-Mendota Water Authority, Westlands Water District.. (O'Hanlon, Daniel) (Filed on 3/10/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/24/2020.]
March 10, 2020 Filing 16 Declaration of Rebecca L. Harms in Support of #13 MOTION to Intervene filed bySan Luis & Delta-Mendota Water Authority, Westlands Water District. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Related document(s) #13 ) (O'Hanlon, Daniel) (Filed on 3/10/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/24/2020.]
March 10, 2020 Filing 15 Declaration of William R. Freeman in Support of #13 MOTION to Intervene filed bySan Luis & Delta-Mendota Water Authority, Westlands Water District. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) #13 ) (O'Hanlon, Daniel) (Filed on 3/10/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/24/2020.]
March 10, 2020 Filing 14 Declaration of Pablo Arroyave in Support of #13 MOTION to Intervene filed bySan Luis & Delta-Mendota Water Authority, Westlands Water District. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) #13 ) (O'Hanlon, Daniel) (Filed on 3/10/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/24/2020.]
March 10, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Intervene filed by San Luis & Delta-Mendota Water Authority, Westlands Water District. Motion Hearing set for 5/14/2020 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Responses due by 3/24/2020. Replies due by 3/31/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Answer)(O'Hanlon, Daniel) (Filed on 3/10/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/24/2020.]
March 10, 2020 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 3/24/2020. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/24/2020.]
March 10, 2020 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE ON REASSIGNMENT. You are noticed that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Laurel Beeler upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Laurel Beeler's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/4/2020 at 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 5/28/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/24/2020.]
March 9, 2020 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to the case. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/24/2020.]
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RELATING CASE. The court finds that the cases are related C19-7897 LB and C20-1299 DMR. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 03/09/2020. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/24/2020.]
March 6, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Colleen R. Flannery (Flannery, Colleen) (Filed on 3/6/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/24/2020.]
February 24, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa Elizabeth Sarine as Counsel for Plaintiffs (Sarine, Lisa) (Filed on 2/24/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/24/2020.]
February 21, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Tracy Lynn Winsor as Counsel for Plaintiffs (Winsor, Tracy) (Filed on 2/21/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/24/2020.]
February 21, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel M. Fuchs (Fuchs, Daniel) (Filed on 2/21/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/24/2020.]
February 21, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to David Bernhardt, Brenda Burman, National Marine Fisheries Service, Chris Oliver, Wilbur Ross, Aurelia Skipwith, U.S. Bureau of Reclamation, U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/24/2020.]
February 21, 2020 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/27/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/3/2020 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/24/2020.]
February 21, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/6/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/24/2020.]
February 20, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Van Loh, Sara) (Filed on 2/20/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/24/2020.]
February 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14201648.). Filed byState of California by and through Attorney General Xavier Becerra, California Environmental Protection Agency, California Natural Resources Agency. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Van Loh, Sara) (Filed on 2/20/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/24/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: California Natural Resources Agency, et al. v. Ross, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of California by and through California Attorney General Xavier Becerra
Represented By: Sara Dena Van Loh
Represented By: Colleen R. Flannery, NACED
Represented By: Daniel M. Fuchs
Represented By: Lisa Elizabeth Sarine
Represented By: Tracy Lynn Winsor
Represented By: Colleen Renae Flannery
Represented By: Jeffrey Reusch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: California Environmental Protection Agency
Represented By: Sara Dena Van Loh
Represented By: Colleen R. Flannery, NACED
Represented By: Daniel M. Fuchs
Represented By: Lisa Elizabeth Sarine
Represented By: Tracy Lynn Winsor
Represented By: Colleen Renae Flannery
Represented By: Jeffrey Reusch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: California Natural Resources Agency
Represented By: Sara Dena Van Loh
Represented By: Colleen R. Flannery, NACED
Represented By: Daniel M. Fuchs
Represented By: Lisa Elizabeth Sarine
Represented By: Tracy Lynn Winsor
Represented By: Colleen Renae Flannery
Represented By: Jeffrey Reusch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: San Luis & Delta-Mendota Water Authority
Represented By: Daniel Joseph O'Hanlon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: State Water Contractors
Represented By: Jenna Mandell-Rice, PHV
Represented By: Allison Elaine McAdam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Westlands Water District
Represented By: Rachel Jacobson, NACED
Represented By: Daniel Joseph O'Hanlon
Represented By: Rachel Jacobson, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Tehama-Colusa Canal Authority
Represented By: Samuel E. Bivins
Represented By: Meredith E. Nikkel
Represented By: Brian Edward Hamilton
Represented By: Kevin M. O'Brien
Represented By: Andrea Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Bernhardt
Represented By: Nicole Marie Smith
Represented By: Lesley Lawrence-Hammer
Represented By: Eve W. McDonald, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service
Represented By: Nicole Marie Smith
Represented By: Lesley Lawrence-Hammer
Represented By: Eve W. McDonald, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bureau of Reclamation
Represented By: Nicole Marie Smith
Represented By: Lesley Lawrence-Hammer
Represented By: Eve W. McDonald, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurelia Skipwith
Represented By: Nicole Marie Smith
Represented By: Lesley Lawrence-Hammer
Represented By: Eve W. McDonald, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilbur Ross
Represented By: Nicole Marie Smith
Represented By: Lesley Lawrence-Hammer
Represented By: Eve W. McDonald, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenda Burman
Represented By: Nicole Marie Smith
Represented By: Lesley Lawrence-Hammer
Represented By: Eve W. McDonald, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Marine Fisheries Service
Represented By: Nicole Marie Smith
Represented By: Lesley Lawrence-Hammer
Represented By: Eve W. McDonald, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Oliver
Represented By: Nicole Marie Smith
Represented By: Lesley Lawrence-Hammer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Friant Water Authority
Represented By: Sara Vink Mogharabi, PHV
Represented By: Matthew G. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arvin Edison Water Storage District
Represented By: Sara Vink Mogharabi, PHV
Represented By: Matthew G. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Sacramento River Intervenors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Oji Brothers Farm, Inc.
Represented By: Samuel E. Bivins
Represented By: Meredith E. Nikkel
Represented By: Brian Edward Hamilton
Represented By: Kevin M. O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Sutter Mutual Water Company
Represented By: Samuel E. Bivins
Represented By: Meredith E. Nikkel
Represented By: Brian Edward Hamilton
Represented By: Kevin M. O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Maxwell Irrigation District
Represented By: Samuel E. Bivins
Represented By: Meredith E. Nikkel
Represented By: Brian Edward Hamilton
Represented By: Kevin M. O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: River Garden Farms, Inc.
Represented By: Samuel E. Bivins
Represented By: Meredith E. Nikkel
Represented By: Brian Edward Hamilton
Represented By: Kevin M. O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Pleasant Grove-Verona Mutual Water Company
Represented By: Samuel E. Bivins
Represented By: Meredith E. Nikkel
Represented By: Brian Edward Hamilton
Represented By: Kevin M. O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Glenn-Colusa Irrigation District
Represented By: Samuel E. Bivins
Represented By: Meredith E. Nikkel
Represented By: Jared Stanton Mueller
Represented By: Andrew Morrow Hitchings
Represented By: Brian Edward Hamilton
Represented By: Kevin M. O'Brien
Represented By: Stuart Leslie Somach
Represented By: Brittany Kirsten Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Howald Farms, Inc.
Represented By: Samuel E. Bivins
Represented By: Meredith E. Nikkel
Represented By: Brian Edward Hamilton
Represented By: Kevin M. O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Windswept Land and Livestock Company
Represented By: Samuel E. Bivins
Represented By: Meredith E. Nikkel
Represented By: Brian Edward Hamilton
Represented By: Kevin M. O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Reclamation District 108
Represented By: Samuel E. Bivins
Represented By: Meredith E. Nikkel
Represented By: Brian Edward Hamilton
Represented By: Kevin M. O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Henry D. Richter, et al.
Represented By: Samuel E. Bivins
Represented By: Meredith E. Nikkel
Represented By: Brian Edward Hamilton
Represented By: Kevin M. O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Pelger Road 1700 LLC
Represented By: Samuel E. Bivins
Represented By: Meredith E. Nikkel
Represented By: Jared Stanton Mueller
Represented By: Andrew Morrow Hitchings
Represented By: Brian Edward Hamilton
Represented By: Kevin M. O'Brien
Represented By: Stuart Leslie Somach
Represented By: Brittany Kirsten Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Contra Costa Water District
Represented By: Marc R. Bruner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Conaway Preservation Group LLC
Represented By: Samuel E. Bivins
Represented By: Meredith E. Nikkel
Represented By: Jared Stanton Mueller
Represented By: Andrew Morrow Hitchings
Represented By: Brian Edward Hamilton
Represented By: Kevin M. O'Brien
Represented By: Stuart Leslie Somach
Represented By: Brittany Kirsten Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: City of Redding
Represented By: Samuel E. Bivins
Represented By: Meredith E. Nikkel
Represented By: Andrew Morrow Hitchings
Represented By: Brian Edward Hamilton
Represented By: Kevin M. O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Oji Partnership, Inc.
Represented By: Samuel E. Bivins
Represented By: Meredith E. Nikkel
Represented By: Brian Edward Hamilton
Represented By: Kevin M. O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Provident Irrigation District
Represented By: Samuel E. Bivins
Represented By: Meredith E. Nikkel
Represented By: Brian Edward Hamilton
Represented By: Kevin M. O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Princeton-Codora-Glenn Irrigation District
Represented By: Samuel E. Bivins
Represented By: Meredith E. Nikkel
Represented By: Brian Edward Hamilton
Represented By: Kevin M. O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: David and Alice te Velde Family Trust
Represented By: Samuel E. Bivins
Represented By: Meredith E. Nikkel
Represented By: Jared Stanton Mueller
Represented By: Andrew Morrow Hitchings
Represented By: Brian Edward Hamilton
Represented By: Kevin M. O'Brien
Represented By: Stuart Leslie Somach
Represented By: Brittany Kirsten Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Tisdale Irrigation and Drainage Company
Represented By: Samuel E. Bivins
Represented By: Meredith E. Nikkel
Represented By: Brian Edward Hamilton
Represented By: Kevin M. O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Reclamation District 104
Represented By: Samuel E. Bivins
Represented By: Meredith E. Nikkel
Represented By: Brian Edward Hamilton
Represented By: Kevin M. O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Reclamation District No. 1004
Represented By: Meredith E. Nikkel
Represented By: Jared Stanton Mueller
Represented By: Andrew Morrow Hitchings
Represented By: Stuart Leslie Somach
Represented By: Brittany Kirsten Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Natomas Central Mutual Water Company
Represented By: Samuel E. Bivins
Represented By: Meredith E. Nikkel
Represented By: Brian Edward Hamilton
Represented By: Kevin M. O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Oakdale Irrigation District
Represented By: Timothy J. Wasiewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Pelger Mutual Water Company
Represented By: Samuel E. Bivins
Represented By: Meredith E. Nikkel
Represented By: Brian Edward Hamilton
Represented By: Kevin M. O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Anderson-Cottonwood Irrigation District
Represented By: Samuel E. Bivins
Represented By: Meredith E. Nikkel
Represented By: Jared Stanton Mueller
Represented By: Andrew Morrow Hitchings
Represented By: Brian Edward Hamilton
Represented By: Kevin M. O'Brien
Represented By: Stuart Leslie Somach
Represented By: Brittany Kirsten Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Meridian Farms Water Company
Represented By: Samuel E. Bivins
Represented By: Meredith E. Nikkel
Represented By: Brian Edward Hamilton
Represented By: Kevin M. O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Carter Mutual Water Company
Represented By: Samuel E. Bivins
Represented By: Meredith E. Nikkel
Represented By: Brian Edward Hamilton
Represented By: Kevin M. O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: South San Joaquin Irrigation District
Represented By: Kenneth Michael Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Beverly F. Andreotti, et al.
Represented By: Samuel E. Bivins
Represented By: Meredith E. Nikkel
Represented By: Brian Edward Hamilton
Represented By: Kevin M. O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Knights Landing Investors, LLC
Represented By: Samuel E. Bivins
Represented By: Meredith E. Nikkel
Represented By: Jared Stanton Mueller
Represented By: Andrew Morrow Hitchings
Represented By: Brian Edward Hamilton
Represented By: Kevin M. O'Brien
Represented By: Stuart Leslie Somach
Represented By: Brittany Kirsten Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?